EP 3954687 A1 20220216 - PROCESSES AND INTERMEDIATES USEFUL IN THE PREPARATION OF AN APOPTOSIS-INDUCING AGENT
Title (en)
PROCESSES AND INTERMEDIATES USEFUL IN THE PREPARATION OF AN APOPTOSIS-INDUCING AGENT
Title (de)
VERFAHREN UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES APOPTOSEAUSLÖSENDEN WIRKSTOFFS
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉS ET PRODUITS INTERMÉDIAIRES UTILES POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UN AGENT INDUISANT L'APOPTOSE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 201361780621 P 20130313
- US 201461947850 P 20140304
- EP 17191299 A 20140312
- EP 14715501 A 20140312
- US 2014024224 W 20140312
Abstract (en)
Provided herein is a process for the preparation of an apoptosis-inducing agent, and chemical intermediates thereof. Also provided herein are novel chemical intermediates related to the process provided herein.
IPC 8 full level
C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07C 67/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: CN EP IL RU)
C07C 45/455 (2013.01 - EP IL); C07C 45/68 (2013.01 - EP IL); C07C 47/457 (2013.01 - IL); C07C 67/00 (2013.01 - CN RU); C07C 67/343 (2013.01 - EP IL); C07C 69/76 (2013.01 - IL); C07D 471/04 (2013.01 - CN IL RU)
C-Set (source: CN EP)
CN
EP
Citation (applicant)
- US 201361780621 P 20130313
- US 201461947850 P 20140304
- US 2010305122 A1 20101202 - BRUNCKO MILAN [US], et al
- US 2012108590 A1 20120503 - BIRTALAN ESTHER [DE], et al
- US 2012277210 A1 20121101 - CATRON NATHANIEL [US], et al
- US 2012129853 A1 20120524 - ELMORE STEVEN [US], et al
- US 2012157470 A1 20120621 - CATRON NATHANIEL [US], et al
- WO 2011015096 A1 20110210 - ACTIONS SEMICONDUCTOR CO LTD [CN], et al
- WO 2012071336 A1 20120531 - ABBOTT LAB [US], et al
- WO 0047212 A1 20000817 - ASTRAZENECA UK LTD [GB], et al
- WO 2006059801 A1 20060608 - DAIICHI ASUBIO PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al
- US 3813443 A 19740528 - GUELDNER R, et al
- GB 585940 A 19470228 - KODAK LTD
- WO 2009117626 A2 20090924 - ABBOTT LAB [US], et al
- J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 81, 1959, pages 743 - 747
- TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 49, no. 12, 2008, pages 2034 - 2037
- J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 72, 1950, pages 1215 - 1218
- ORGANOMETALLICS, vol. 27, no. 21, 2008, pages 5605 - 5611
Citation (search report)
- [A] WO 2011150016 A1 20111201 - ABBOTT LAB [US], et al
- [Y] ARRENDONDO ET AL.: "Preparation of t-Butyl-3-Bromo-5-Formylbenzoate Through Selective Metal-Halogen Exchange Reactions", ORGANIC SYNTHESES, vol. 89, 1 January 2012 (2012-01-01), pages 460, XP055128994, ISSN: 0078-6209, DOI: 10.15227/orgsyn.089.0460
- [Y] T. RAUSIS ET AL: "The Basicity Gradient-Driven Migration of Iodine: Conferring Regioflexibility on the Substitution of Fluoroarenes", EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., 1 January 2002 (2002-01-01), pages 3351 - 3358, XP055115669
- [A] V. BAVETSIAS ET AL: "Synthesis of N-substituted derivatives of tert-butyl 4-aminobenzoate via a palladium-catalysed reaction", J. CHEM. RESEARCH, 1 September 2000 (2000-09-01), pages 418 - 419, XP055324460, DOI: 10.3184/030823400103168100
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2014165044 A1 20141009; AU 2014248742 A1 20150910; AU 2014248742 B2 20180405; AU 2018203977 A1 20180621; AU 2018203977 B2 20190711; BR 112015021540 A2 20170718; BR 112015021540 B1 20220419; BR 122021025053 B1 20220906; BR 122021025062 B1 20220419; CA 2903797 A1 20141009; CA 2903797 C 20220621; CA 3090936 A1 20141009; CA 3090936 C 20230207; CA 3183040 A1 20141009; CL 2015002548 A1 20160318; CN 105164128 A 20151216; CN 105164128 B 20171212; CN 107721851 A 20180223; CN 107721851 B 20210625; CN 111960944 A 20201120; CR 20150495 A 20151203; CY 1120576 T1 20190710; DK 2970263 T3 20180813; EP 2970263 A1 20160120; EP 2970263 B1 20180509; EP 3293185 A1 20180314; EP 3569588 A1 20191120; EP 3954687 A1 20220216; EP 4019491 A1 20220629; ES 2683378 T3 20180926; HK 1216644 A1 20161125; HK 1251231 A1 20190125; HR P20181273 T1 20181116; HU E039046 T2 20181228; IL 240779 A0 20151029; IL 240779 B 20180430; IL 257109 B 20190131; JP 2016514137 A 20160519; JP 2018138571 A 20180906; JP 6357220 B2 20180711; JP 6578037 B2 20190918; KR 102230339 B1 20210323; KR 20150128994 A 20151118; LT 2970263 T 20180827; MX 2015012000 A 20151201; MX 365343 B 20190530; MY 192466 A 20220822; NZ 711315 A 20201030; NZ 751139 A 20201030; PE 20151809 A1 20151225; PE 20191685 A1 20191119; PH 12015501960 A1 20160111; PH 12015501960 B1 20160111; PH 12018501094 A1 20191125; PL 2970263 T3 20181031; PT 2970263 T 20181003; RS 57569 B1 20181031; RU 2015143637 A 20170419; RU 2660424 C2 20180706; SG 10201701680Y A 20170427; SG 11201507360X A 20151029; SI 2970263 T1 20180928; TW 201522334 A 20150616; TW 201825491 A 20180716; TW I631121 B 20180801; TW I735759 B 20210811; UA 118667 C2 20190225; UY 35394 A 20140930; UY 39847 A 20220930; UY 39848 A 20220930
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2014024224 W 20140312; AU 2014248742 A 20140312; AU 2018203977 A 20180605; BR 112015021540 A 20140312; BR 122021025053 A 20140312; BR 122021025062 A 20140312; CA 2903797 A 20140312; CA 3090936 A 20140312; CA 3183040 A 20140312; CL 2015002548 A 20150909; CN 201480025215 A 20140312; CN 201711105971 A 20140312; CN 202010877947 A 20140312; CR 20150495 A 20150916; CY 181100834 T 20180809; DK 14715501 T 20140312; EP 14715501 A 20140312; EP 17191299 A 20140312; EP 19183264 A 20140312; EP 21194409 A 20140312; EP 22154798 A 20140312; ES 14715501 T 20140312; HK 16104667 A 20160422; HK 18110753 A 20160422; HR P20181273 T 20180809; HU E14715501 A 20140312; IL 24077915 A 20150824; IL 25710918 A 20180123; JP 2016501441 A 20140312; JP 2018077547 A 20180413; KR 20157029117 A 20140312; LT 14715501 T 20140312; MX 2015012000 A 20140312; MY PI2019006129 A 20140312; NZ 71131514 A 20140312; NZ 75113914 A 20140312; PE 2015001892 A 20140312; PE 2019001821 A 20140312; PH 12015501960 A 20150904; PH 12018501094 A 20180521; PL 14715501 T 20140312; PT 14715501 T 20140312; RS P20180939 A 20140312; RU 2015143637 A 20140312; SG 10201701680Y A 20140312; SG 11201507360X A 20140312; SI 201430826 T 20140312; TW 103108953 A 20140312; TW 107109344 A 20140312; UA A201509919 A 20140312; UY 35394 A 20140312; UY 39847 A 20140312; UY 39848 A 20140312