EP 4022931 A4 20230104 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING DEBLOCKING
Title (en)
APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING DEBLOCKING
Title (de)
VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSPERRUNG
Title (fr)
APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UN DÉBLOCAGE
Publication
Application
Priority
- IN 201931038249 A 20190923
- CN 2020116356 W 20200921
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2021057629A1] The present disclosure relates to a method and apparatus for determining filtering related parameters for deblocking filtering on a sub-block edge between a first and a second sub-block of a coding unit that, even in the case of motion vector refinement, do not require refined motion information.
IPC 8 full level
H04N 19/86 (2014.01); H04N 19/70 (2014.01); H04N 19/80 (2014.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H04N 19/70 (2014.11); H04N 19/86 (2014.11)
Citation (search report)
- [XI] US 2013101031 A1 20130425 - VAN DER AUWERA GEERT [US], et al
- [XI] US 2013259120 A1 20131003 - VAN DER AUWERA GEERT [US], et al
- [X] "Test Model 4 of Versatile Video Coding (VTM 3)", no. n18275, 24 March 2019 (2019-03-24), XP030212829, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/125_Marrakech/wg11/w18275-v2-w18275.zip w18275.docx> [retrieved on 20190324]
- [A] ANDERSSON K ET AL: "Non-CE5: Deblocking based on DMVR refined motion", no. m48250, 20 June 2019 (2019-06-20), XP030205457, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/127_Gothenburg/wg11/m48250-JVET-O0158-v1-JVET-O0158.zip JVET-N1001-v8_clean_JVET-O0158.docx> [retrieved on 20190620]
- [XP] JEEVA RAJ ARUMUGAM (ITTIAM) ET AL: "Non CE5: DMVR internal edge deblocking without using refined MVs", no. JVET-P0306 ; m50271, 1 October 2019 (2019-10-01), XP030216886, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/16_Geneva/wg11/JVET-P0306-v4.zip JVET-P0306-v4/JVET-P0306-v4.docx> [retrieved on 20191001]
- See references of WO 2021057629A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2021057629 A1 20210401; EP 4022931 A1 20220706; EP 4022931 A4 20230104
DOCDB simple family (application)
CN 2020116356 W 20200921; EP 20870065 A 20200921