EP 4112705 A1 20230104 - AQUEOUS LUBRICATING COMPOSITION COMPRISING MOS2 NANOSHEET
Title (en)
AQUEOUS LUBRICATING COMPOSITION COMPRISING MOS2 NANOSHEET
Title (de)
WÄSSRIGE SCHMIERMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT MOS2-NANOBLATT
Title (fr)
COMPOSITION LUBRIFIANTE AQUEUSE COMPRENANT UNE FEUILLE NANOMÉTRIQUE DE MOS2
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 21305909 A 20210701
Abstract (en)
The present invention relates to a lubricating composition comprising:- water;- surfactant; and- h-MOS<sub>2</sub> nanosheets;wherein the h-MOS<sub>2</sub> nanosheets are obtained in-situ in the lubricating composition by liquid-phase exfoliation of bulk MOS<sub>2</sub> nanoparticles.
IPC 8 full level
C10M 125/22 (2006.01); C10M 171/06 (2006.01); C10M 173/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/12 (2006.01); C10N 20/06 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/02 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
C10M 125/22 (2013.01 - EP US); C10M 171/06 (2013.01 - EP); C10M 173/02 (2013.01 - EP US); C10M 177/00 (2013.01 - US); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01 - EP US); C10M 2201/066 (2013.01 - EP US); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01 - EP); C10N 2010/12 (2013.01 - EP); C10N 2020/06 (2013.01 - EP US); C10N 2030/06 (2013.01 - EP); C10N 2040/02 (2013.01 - EP US); C10N 2040/04 (2013.01 - EP US); C10N 2040/044 (2020.05 - EP)
C-Set (source: EP)
Citation (search report)
- [IA] CN 106520354 A 20170322 - UNIV QINGDAO, et al
- [A] US 2012149616 A1 20120614 - SCHMID-AMELUNXEN MARTIN [DE], et al
- [XI] GUARDIA LAURA ET AL: "Production of aqueous dispersions of inorganic graphene analogues by exfoliation and stabilization with non-ionic surfactants", RSC ADVANCES, vol. 4, no. 27, 5 March 2014 (2014-03-05), GB, pages 14115 - 14127, XP055869911, ISSN: 2046-2069, DOI: 10.1039/C4RA00212A
- [XI] RONAN J. SMITH ET AL: "Large-Scale Exfoliation of Inorganic Layered Compounds in Aqueous Surfactant Solutions", ADVANCED MATERIALS, vol. 23, no. 34, 28 July 2011 (2011-07-28), pages 3944 - 3948, XP055056822, ISSN: 0935-9648, DOI: 10.1002/adma.201102584
- [IA] WANG YONGXIA ET AL: "Friction reduction of water based lubricant with highly dispersed functional MoS2nanosheets", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES A: PHYSIOCHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING ASPECTS, vol. 562, 22 November 2018 (2018-11-22), pages 321 - 328, XP085566909, ISSN: 0927-7757, DOI: 10.1016/J.COLSURFA.2018.11.047
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
Designated validation state (EPC)
KH MA MD TN
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 4112705 A1 20230104; CN 117580933 A 20240220; EP 4363534 A1 20240508; US 2024228906 A1 20240711; WO 2023275236 A1 20230105
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 21305909 A 20210701; CN 202280046717 A 20220630; EP 2022068048 W 20220630; EP 22740853 A 20220630; US 202218571910 A 20220630