EP 4116445 A1 20230111 - HOT-ROLLED WEATHER RESISTANT STEEL PRODUCT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME
Title (en)
HOT-ROLLED WEATHER RESISTANT STEEL PRODUCT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME
Title (de)
WARMGEWALZTES WETTERFESTES STAHLPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON
Title (fr)
PRODUIT D'ACIER LAMINÉ À CHAUD RÉSISTANT AUX INTEMPÉRIES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 21184520 A 20210708
Abstract (en)
This invention relates to a hot-rolled weather resistant steel product comprising a composition consisting of, in terms of weight percentages (wt. %): C 0.015 - 0.045, Si 0.15 - 0.75, Mn 0.8 - 1.6, Al 0.005 - 0.12, Nb 0.0 - 0.08, Cu 0.2 - 1.0, Cr 0.35 - 1.0, Ni 0.01 - 1.0, Ti 0.0 - 0.12, Mo > 0.05 - 0.35, V 0.0 - 0.14, B < 0.0006, P ≤ 0.035, S ≤ 0.025, W optionally < 0.1 %, Co optionally < 0.1 %, N < 0.0200 %, H < 0.0004 %, O < 0.0100 %, Ca < 0.01 %, REM < 0.1 %, and remainder Fe and inevitable impurities. Said steel product has a microstructure comprising a matrix consisting of, in terms of volume percentages (vol. %), measured at ¼ thickness: Polygonal ferrite (PF): 0 ≤ PF ≤ 10, Quasipolygonal ferrite (QPF): 5 ≤ QPF ≤ 36, Granular bainite (GB): 20 ≤ GB ≤ 70, Lath bainite (LB): 16 ≤ LB ≤ 80, Retained austenite (RA): RA ≤ 2, Martensite/austenite constituents (MA): MA ≤ 5, Pearlite (P): P ≤ 5, and GB+LB > 50 %,
IPC 8 full level
C21D 1/19 (2006.01); C21D 1/25 (2006.01); C21D 1/26 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/42 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/48 (2006.01); C22C 38/50 (2006.01); C22C 38/54 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C21D 1/19 (2013.01); C21D 1/25 (2013.01); C21D 1/26 (2013.01); C21D 8/0226 (2013.01); C21D 8/0263 (2013.01); C21D 9/46 (2013.01); C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/002 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C22C 38/42 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C22C 38/46 (2013.01); C22C 38/48 (2013.01); C22C 38/50 (2013.01); C22C 38/54 (2013.01); C21D 2211/001 (2013.01); C21D 2211/002 (2013.01); C21D 2211/005 (2013.01); C21D 2211/008 (2013.01); C21D 2211/009 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] CN 102220547 A 20111019 - MAANSHAN IRON & STEEL CO LTD
- [A] CN 104131238 B 20160824
- [A] EP 2832890 A1 20150204 - JFE STEEL CORP [JP]
- [A] EP 0666332 A1 19950809 - NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]
- [IA] LI WENBIN ET AL: "Influence of niobium on properties of bridge steel HPS 70W", JINSHU RECHULI (2000), JINSHU RECHULI BIANJIBU, JP, vol. 36, no. 7, 1 January 2011 (2011-01-01), pages 43 - 45, XP009531340, ISSN: 0254-6051
- [A] QU ET AL: "Effect of processing parameters on MA islands and mechanical performances of 700 MPa grade weathering steel", ZHONGGUO YEJIN, CN, vol. 19, no. 6, 1 January 2009 (2009-01-01), pages 18 - 25, XP009531339, ISSN: 1006-9356
- [A] GUO J ET AL: "Weather resistance of low carbon high performance bridge steel", MATERIALS AND DESIGN, LONDON, GB, vol. 30, no. 1, 1 January 2009 (2009-01-01), pages 129 - 134, XP023611651, ISSN: 0261-3069, [retrieved on 20080425], DOI: 10.1016/J.MATDES.2008.04.038
- [A] GAO K ET AL: "Corrosion behaviour of low-carbon bainitic steel under a constant elastic load", CORROSION SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, vol. 52, no. 10, 1 October 2010 (2010-10-01), pages 3428 - 3434, XP027206811, ISSN: 0010-938X, [retrieved on 20100701]
- [T] F.A. KHALID ET AL: "Role of ferrite/pearlite banded structure and segregation on mechanical properties of microalloyed hot rolled steel", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 15, no. 10, 1 October 1999 (1999-10-01), GB, pages 1209 - 1215, XP055767348, ISSN: 0267-0836, DOI: 10.1179/026708399101505121
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
Designated validation state (EPC)
KH MA MD TN
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 22183442 A 20220706