EP 4127222 A4 20240501 - PROGNOSTIC AND TREATMENT METHODS FOR THYROID CANCER
Title (en)
PROGNOSTIC AND TREATMENT METHODS FOR THYROID CANCER
Title (de)
PROGNOSE- UND BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SCHILDDRÜSENKREBS
Title (fr)
MÉTHODES DE PRONOSTIC ET DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DE LA THYROÏDE
Publication
Application
Priority
- CA 2021050449 W 20210401
- US 202063004852 P 20200403
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2021195787A1] Disclosed herein are methods determining the risk of recurrence of papillary thyroid cancer in a patient. The methods comprise isolating RNA from a tumor of the patient; determining the level of expression of two or more genes or gene products of a gene signature comprising: ATG14, MYO3A, ERCC5, SLC43A1, ABCC8, LTK, COPS2, CCNA2, BNIP3, FAM86C1P, GNG4, GCFC2, EEF1A2, TXNL4B, SEPSECS, ZNF215, KIF4A, EZH2, CDCA8, DISP1, SNX29P2, ATP1B1, ZNF620, HIST4H4, CENPL, GATAD1, C2orf88, WWC3, SKA3, HJURP, LOC728613, GTPBP8, RPRM, FBXO4, TICRR, AGFG2, TTK, TAFA2, MTMR14, WDR1, NEK2, RRAGA, EIF2A, REP15, NUDT15, LANCL2, NFATC2IP, GTPBP2, KHNYN, CLDN12, DNAH11, ASPHD1, REXO5, HIST2H2BF, C12orf76, MUC21, PGBD5, ABCC6P1, RHBDF1, CHAF1B, MOV10, CAB39L, FN1, DDX19B, BUB1, GPSM2, MSH5, ETV7, SUN1, GRAMD1C, LACTB2, LOC652276, EXOSC10, NUP210, ACOX3, UNC5CL, GNAO1, CGN, ZC3H18, CTSC, MFSD13A, and CCDC183; and determining the risk of PTC recurrence using the expression levels of the two or more genes.
IPC 8 full level
C12Q 1/6809 (2018.01); C12Q 1/6806 (2018.01); C12Q 1/6886 (2018.01); G16B 20/00 (2019.01); G16B 25/10 (2019.01); G16H 50/30 (2018.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01 - EP KR US); G16B 20/00 (2019.02 - EP KR); G16B 25/10 (2019.02 - EP KR US); G16H 50/30 (2018.01 - EP KR US); C12Q 2600/118 (2013.01 - EP KR US); C12Q 2600/158 (2013.01 - EP KR US)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] RUIZ EMMANUELLE M L ET AL: "A novel gene panel for prediction of lymph-node metastasis and recurrence in patients with thyroid cancer", SURGERY, MOSBY, INC, US, vol. 167, no. 1, 9 November 2019 (2019-11-09), pages 73 - 79, XP085942075, ISSN: 0039-6060, [retrieved on 20191110], DOI: 10.1016/J.SURG.2019.06.058
- [Y] CHIEN MING-NAN ET AL: "Recurrence-associated genes in papillary thyroid cancer: An analysis of data from The Cancer Genome Atlas", SURGERY, vol. 161, no. 6, 2 June 2017 (2017-06-02), US, pages 1642 - 1650, XP093143875, ISSN: 0039-6060, [retrieved on 20240321], DOI: 10.1016/j.surg.2016.12.039
- [Y] FILETTI S. ET AL: "Thyroid cancer: ESMO Clinical Practice Guidelines for diagnosis, treatment and follow-up", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY, vol. 30, no. 12, 2 December 2019 (2019-12-02), pages 1856 - 1883, XP093144135, ISSN: 0923-7534, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://dul.usage.elsevier.com/doi/> [retrieved on 20240321], DOI: 10.1093/annonc/mdz400
- [Y] XUE LIQIONG ET AL: "EZH2 upregulation by ER[alpha] induces proliferation and migration of papillary thyroid carcinoma", BMC CANCER, vol. 19, no. 1, 2 December 2019 (2019-12-02), LONDON, GB, XP093144154, ISSN: 1471-2407, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6852908/pdf/12885_2019_Article_6306.pdf> [retrieved on 20240321], DOI: 10.1186/s12885-019-6306-9
- See also references of WO 2021195787A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2021195787 A1 20211007; AU 2021245285 A1 20220929; CA 3165664 A1 20211007; EP 4127222 A1 20230208; EP 4127222 A4 20240501; JP 2023520118 A 20230516; KR 20220163971 A 20221212; US 2023118252 A1 20230420
DOCDB simple family (application)
CA 2021050449 W 20210401; AU 2021245285 A 20210401; CA 3165664 A 20210401; EP 21780864 A 20210401; JP 2022548959 A 20210401; KR 20227035535 A 20210401; US 202117906211 A 20210401