EP 4173697 A1 20230503 - METHOD AND SYSTEM TO MONITOR AND CONTROL CONTINUOUS ULTRAFILTRATION PROCESS UNITS
Title (en)
METHOD AND SYSTEM TO MONITOR AND CONTROL CONTINUOUS ULTRAFILTRATION PROCESS UNITS
Title (de)
VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND STEUERUNG KONTINUIERLICHER ULTRAFILTRATIONSPROZESSEINHEITEN
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE COMMANDE D'UNITÉS DE TRAITEMENT PAR ULTRAFILTRATION CONTINUE
Publication
Application
Priority
IN 202121050333 A 20211102
Abstract (en)
This disclosure relates generally to method and system to monitor and control continuous ultrafiltration (UF) process units. In real time, continuous operation of UF to handle variating concentration in feed stream is tedious and complex. The UF plant system receives a plurality of input data configured to UF process units and from the real time data outliers are removed and missing values are imputed. The prediction module predicts a volumetric concentration factor (VCF) value and a throughput value by selecting a model from a model repository. The optimization module optimizes the VCF value, and the throughput value based on a plurality of optimal variables recommended for a given feed concentration. The UF plant system controls the VCF value and the throughput value for a predefined period of a prediction horizon based on a plurality of trajectory profiles recommended for the feed flow rate, the pressure data, and a feed concentration.
IPC 8 full level
B01D 61/14 (2006.01); B01D 61/22 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B01D 61/145 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 61/22 (2013.01 - EP US); B01D 2311/24 (2013.01 - EP); B01D 2313/70 (2022.08 - EP); B01D 2313/701 (2022.08 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] WO 2009104035 A1 20090827 - ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al
- [A] US 6609070 B1 20030819 - LUECK STANLEY R [US]
- [A] WO 2021205479 A2 20211014 - TATA CONSULTANCY SERVICES LTD [IN]
- [I] THAKUR GARIMA ET AL: "Implementing PAT for single-pass tangential flow ultrafiltration for continuous manufacturing of monoclonal antibodies", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 613, 18 July 2020 (2020-07-18), XP086250450, ISSN: 0376-7388, [retrieved on 20200718], DOI: 10.1016/J.MEMSCI.2020.118492
- [A] THAKUR GARIMA ET AL: "Control of surge tanks for continuous manufacturing of monoclonal antibodies", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, vol. 118, no. 5, 14 April 2021 (2021-04-14), Hoboken, USA, pages 1913 - 1931, XP093008281, ISSN: 0006-3592, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/full-xml/10.1002/bit.27706> [retrieved on 20221215], DOI: 10.1002/bit.27706
- [A] THAKUR GARIMA ET AL: "Near Infrared Spectroscopy as a PAT tool for monitoring and control of protein and excipient concentration in ultrafiltration of highly concentrated antibody formulations", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 600, 9 March 2021 (2021-03-09), XP086554385, ISSN: 0378-5173, [retrieved on 20210309], DOI: 10.1016/J.IJPHARM.2021.120456
- [A] WASALATHANTHRI DHANUKA P. ET AL: "Real-time monitoring of quality attributes by in-line Fourier transform infrared spectroscopic sensors at ultrafiltration and diafiltration of bioprocess", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, vol. 117, no. 12, 18 August 2020 (2020-08-18), Hoboken, USA, pages 3766 - 3774, XP093008704, ISSN: 0006-3592, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/full-xml/10.1002/bit.27532> [retrieved on 20221215], DOI: 10.1002/bit.27532
- [A] HUTER MAXIMILIAN J. ET AL: "Model-Based Design and Process Optimization of Continuous Single Pass Tangential Flow Filtration Focusing on Continuous Bioprocessing", PROCESSES, vol. 7, no. 6, 28 May 2019 (2019-05-28), pages 317, XP093008705, DOI: 10.3390/pr7060317
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC ME MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA
Designated validation state (EPC)
KH MA MD TN
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 22202770 A 20221020; US 202218049338 A 20221025