EP 4195207 A1 20230614 - OXRAM/FERAM MIXED TECHNOLOGY NONVOLATILE MEMORIES
Title (en)
OXRAM/FERAM MIXED TECHNOLOGY NONVOLATILE MEMORIES
Title (de)
NICHTFLÜCHTIGE SPEICHER IN OXRAM/FERAM-MISCHTECHNOLOGIE
Title (fr)
MÉMOIRES NON VOLATILES À TECHNOLOGIES MIXTES OXRAM/FERAM
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 2113286 A 20211210
Abstract (en)
[origin: US2023186061A1] A data storage circuit includes a matrix array of memory cells. The memory cells are configurable and non-volatile. Each one is intended to operate in either one of two operating configurations; the first operating configuration corresponding to a ferroelectric random-access memory; and the second operating configuration corresponding to a metal-oxide resistive random-access memory. Each memory cell comprises: a stack of thin layers in the following order: a first layer made of an electrically conductive material forming a lower electrode, a second layer made of a dielectric and ferroelectric material and a third layer made of electrically conductive material forming an upper electrode.
Abstract (fr)
Un circuit de stockage de données comporte une matrice de cellules mémoire qui sont configurables et non volatiles (NVM), chacune cellule étant destinée à fonctionner selon l'une quelconque parmi deux configurations de fonctionnement, la première configuration de fonctionnement (CONF1) correspondant à une mémoire ferroélectrique à polarisation électrique variable et la seconde configuration de fonctionnement (CONF2) correspondant une mémoire résistive à filament conducteur variable. Chaque cellule mémoire comprend une première couche (C1) en un matériau électriquement conducteur formant une électrode inférieure (EL1), une seconde couche (C2) en un matériau diélectrique et ferroélectrique, et une troisième couche (C3) en matériau électriquement conducteur formant une électrode supérieure (EL2).
IPC 8 full level
G11C 11/22 (2006.01); G11C 13/00 (2006.01); H10N 70/20 (2023.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G06N 3/063 (2013.01 - US); G06N 3/08 (2013.01 - US); G11C 11/005 (2013.01 - EP US); G11C 11/221 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 11/2273 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 11/2275 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 11/2293 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 13/0007 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 13/0026 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 13/004 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 13/0061 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 13/0069 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 2013/0045 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 2013/0054 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 2213/79 (2013.01 - EP); G11C 2213/82 (2013.01 - EP); H10N 70/24 (2023.02 - EP); H10N 70/826 (2023.02 - EP); H10N 70/8833 (2023.02 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [A] CN 113540099 A 20211022 - TAIWAN SEMICONDUCTOR MFG CO LTD & US 2021408021 A1 20211230 - YOUNG BO-FENG [TW], et al
- [A] US 2020168264 A1 20200528 - ENDOH TETSUO [JP], et al
- [A] COVI E ET AL: "Ferroelectric Tunneling Junctions for Edge Computing", 2021 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 22-28 MAY 2021, DAEGU, KR, 22 May 2021 (2021-05-22), XP033933573, DOI: 10.1109/ISCAS51556.2021.9401800
- [AD] MAX B ET AL: "Interplay between ferroelectric and resistive switching in doped crystalline HfO2", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 123, 134102, 4 April 2018 (2018-04-04), XP012227531, DOI: 10.1063/1.5015985
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC ME MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA
Designated validation state (EPC)
KH MA MD TN
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 4195207 A1 20230614; FR 3130447 A1 20230616; US 2023186061 A1 20230615
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 22211794 A 20221206; FR 2113286 A 20211210; US 202218075347 A 20221205