EP 4310253 A1 20240124 - SOUND BARRIER
Title (en)
SOUND BARRIER
Title (de)
SCHALLSCHUTZBARRIERE
Title (fr)
ÉCRAN ACOUSTIQUE
Publication
Application
Priority
TR 202211688 A 20220722
Abstract (en)
The present invention relates to a sound barrier, which is an acoustic barrier that prevents environmental noise from motor vehicles, rail systems or ventilation units from spreading into the city and reaching people in the building, to be built around the facility or unit at points such as roads or railways, cooling units, industrial facilities, or entertainment venues. The sound barrier of the present invention comprises 5-45 mm single row Q188 steel mesh (1), 5-35 mm wipe iron (3) and 15-45 mm wipe iron (2), Styrene Butadiene Rubber (SBR) granules obtained from the recycling of 1-9 mm end-of-life tires (ELT), binder, water, accelerator, and fire retardant.
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP)
E01F 8/00 (2013.01); E01F 8/0029 (2013.01); E01F 8/007 (2013.01); E01F 8/02 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- CN 207159852 U 20180330 - JIANGSU GUODIAN NEW ENERGY EQUIP CO LTD
- CN 210216199 U 20200331 - SHENZHEN YUKING SOUND BARRIER ENGINEERING TECH CO LTD
- STANSFELD, S. AMATHESON, M. P.: "Noise pollution: non-auditory effects on health", BRITISH MEDICAL BULLETIN, vol. 68, no. 1, 2003, pages 243 - 257, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https:l/doi.org/10.1093/bmb/ldg033>
- OTOKORKULUK, S. B.- Y. Y. M: "SES bariyeri, Gurultu bariyeri - Yente Yapi Ankara", OTOKORKULUK, SES BARIYERI - YENTE YAPI MAKINE, 1 December 2019 (2019-12-01), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.yente.com.tr/tr/ses-bariyeri>
- BARIYERI, H. S.: "Akustik Bariyer Nedir ve Nerelerde Kullanilir?", HATKO SES BARIYERI, 28 January 2021 (2021-01-28), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://hatkosesbariyeri.com/akustik-bariyer-nedir/#:%7E:text=G%C3%BCr%C3%BCIt%C3%BCn%C3%BCn%20yay%C4%B>
- MERSIN BUYUK§EHIR BELEDIYES: "Omrunu Tamamlami§ Lastiklerin (OTL)", YONETIMI, 2021, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://cevre.mersin.bel.tr/omrunu-tamamlamis-lastiklerin-otl-yonetimi>
- BRIGGS, B. H.: "Demand for rubber ''threatens forests.", BBC NEWS, 17 April 2015 (2015-04-17), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://www.bbc.com/news/science-environment-32350985>
Citation (search report)
- [XY] EP 2374769 A1 20111012 - BETONWERK SCHUSTER GMBH [DE]
- [X] WO 2018024263 A1 20180208 - CZECH TECHNICAL UNIV IN PRAGUE [CZ]
- [XY] CN 106801387 A 20170606 - POWERCHINA CHENGDU ENGINEERING CORP LTD
- [XY] CZ 35436 U1 20210927 - INTERTECH PLUS S R O [CZ]
- [A] WO 2015140584 A1 20150924 - LAKUŠIĆ STJEPAN [HR], et al
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
BA ME
Designated validation state (EPC)
KH MA MD TN
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 22188805 A 20220804