Global Patent Index - EP 0504204 B2

EP 0504204 B2 2000-11-29 - INFORMATION AND PUBLICITY SUPPORTS, ESPECIALLY PRESENTATION AND/OR BUSINESS CARDS

Title (en)

INFORMATION AND PUBLICITY SUPPORTS, ESPECIALLY PRESENTATION AND/OR BUSINESS CARDS

Title (de)

INFORMATIONS- UND WERBETRÄGER, INSBESONDERE PRÄSENTATIONS- UND/ODER GESCHÄFTSKARTE

Title (fr)

SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS ET PUBLICITAIRE, NOTAMMENT CARTE DE VISITE ET/OU D'AFFAIRES

Publication

EP 0504204 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91900169 A

Priority

  • DE 9000951 W
  • DE 3941070 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE3941070A1] The invention concerns an information and publicity support, especially presentation and/or business cards, with information on the sender, his business and/or his services, consisting of an information-bearing layer with an image and a text section, preferably sealed between two transparent plastic films (3, 4). In order to promote the useful purpose of such information and publicity supports, especially to render them more versatile and also attract greater notice from the addressee, it is proposed according to the invention that the information-bearing layer should be entirely formed by a transparent front layer (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/10; G06K 19/067

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B42D 15/02 (2006.01); B42D 15/10 (2006.01); G06K 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI LU

EPO simple patent family

DE 3941070 A1 19910613; DE 3941070 C2 19910912; AT 120134 T 19950415; EP 0504204 A1 19920923; EP 0504204 B1 19950322; EP 0504204 B2 20001129; JP H05507033 A 19931014; WO 9108910 A1 19910627

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19951231

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2003-12-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-03-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010311

2001-03-02 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-11-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI LU

1996-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1996-03-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 19951231

1996-02-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 19951231

1995-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 19951231

1995-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Effective date: 19951231

1995-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19951231

1995-12-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Effective date: 19951207

1995-09-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 19950322

1995-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI LU

1995-03-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 19950322

1995-03-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Effective date: 19950322

1995-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950322

1995-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 120134 T 19950415

1993-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19921119

1992-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920526

1992-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI LU