Global Patent Index - EP 0615024 B1

EP 0615024 B1 2001-04-11 - Load-independent speed control of hydraulic actuators for construction machines

Title (en)

Load-independent speed control of hydraulic actuators for construction machines

Title (de)

Lastdruckunabhängige Steuerung der Geschwindigkeit von hydraulischen Stellelementen an Baumaschinen

Title (fr)

Commande de vitesse, ne dépendant pas de la pression de charge pour éléments hydrauliques de réglage sur des machines de construction

Publication

EP 0615024 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94101011 A

Priority

DE 4307872 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0615024A2] Load-independent speed control of hydraulic actuators in the case of leading loads, in particular for construction machines, is proposed, comprising at least one pump, at least one control spool, and at least one pressure balance. The pressure balance is inserted either in the connecting line of the space, to be emptied in a controlled manner, of the actuator, designed as hydraulic cylinder, to the control spool or else in the line between the outlet of the control spool and the tank. The return area of the associated control piston is designed as a differential-pressure orifice. The pressure indication before the passage of the oil flow through the differential-pressure orifice to the pressure balance can be brought about via a line to the side of the pressure balance remote from the spring chamber. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 11/044 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/2232 (2013.01); E02F 9/2203 (2013.01); E02F 9/2225 (2013.01); E02F 9/2296 (2013.01); F15B 11/0445 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20553 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30535 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3055 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3056 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3144 (2013.01); F15B 2211/351 (2013.01); F15B 2211/353 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6054 (2013.01); F15B 2211/75 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0615024 A2 19940914; EP 0615024 A3 19960925; EP 0615024 B1 20010411; AT 200538 T 20010415; DE 4307872 A1 19940922; DE 4307872 C2 20010517; ES 2155837 T3 20010601

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070125

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080126

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080126

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: O&K *ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL A.G.

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070116

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155837 T3

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409720 20010517

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2001-04-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200538 T 20010415

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981223

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960827

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1994-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL