Global patent index - EP 0626496 B1

EP 0626496 B1 2000-10-18 - Refrigerator door assembly and method

Title (en)

Refrigerator door assembly and method

Title (de)

Kühlschranktüranordnung und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour porte de réfrigérateur

Publication

EP 0626496 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93303996 A

Priority

EP 93303996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0626496A1] A refrigerator door assembly (11) is mounted on a stationary frame (10) of a refrigeration unit and comprises a door frame (15) integrally molded about a thermo-pane (14) in sealing relationship therewith. The door frame is hingedly mounted on the stationary frame (10) of the refrigeration unit by a pair of upper and lower hinge pins (16,17). A torsion bar (19), integrally molded within the door frame (15) and secured to one of the hinge pins (16), functions to constantly apply a closing force on the door frame (15) to move the door assembly (11) into sealing contact with the stationary frame (10) of the refrigeration unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 1/12; A47F 3/04; E05D 5/12; E05D 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01); E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 7/08 (2006.01); E05F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/043 (2013.01); E05D 5/128 (2013.01); E05D 7/081 (2013.01); E05F 1/123 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/202 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0626496 A1 19941130; EP 0626496 B1 20001018; DE 69329573 D1 20001123; DE 69329573 T2 20010531

INPADOC legal status

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-05-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010521

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010518

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010514

- Year of fee payment: 9

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69329573

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-23

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961002

1995-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950331

1994-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB