Global patent index - EP 0672475 B1

EP 0672475 B1 2000-06-07 - Partially thick-walled elongated metallic member and methods of making and connecting the same

Title (en)

Partially thick-walled elongated metallic member and methods of making and connecting the same

Title (de)

Längliche Metallelemente mit bereichsweise verdickter Wand und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verbindung

Title (fr)

Elément métallique allongé à paroi partiellement épaisse et procédé pour la fabrication et la connection de celle-ci

Publication

EP 0672475 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94309896 A

Priority

  • JP 2316794 A
  • JP 5988994 A
  • JP 15674494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0672475A1] A method of and an apparatus for manufacturing an elongated metallic member (1) having at least one thickened wall area defined at a portion thereof. That portion of the elongated metallic member (1) is heated to a plasticizable temperature to form a heated area (5) while the latter is moved along the metallic member (1) and, at the same time, axially inwardly compressed to allow upsetting at the heated area (5), to thereby form a thickened wall area. A trailing portion (1a) of the thickened wall area of the elongated metallic member (1) immediately after the heated area (5) is cooled. The ratio (V/W) of a compressing speed V relative to the moving speed W of the position of the heated area (5) in reference to the thickened portion (1a) of the metallic member (1) is progressively increased from a small value, employed at an initial stage of wall thickening, along the metallic member (1) to an aimed value, employed at a steady stage of wall thickening, to thereby progressively increase a wall thickening ratio along the metallic member (1) to a designed value. The subsequent wall thickening is carried out while the ratio is maintained at said designed value for the steady stage of wall thickening. A method of connecting two metallic members (1) in end-to-end fashion and a method of connecting a beam to the metallic member (1) are also disclosed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 37/16; B21J 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/15 (2006.01); B21C 37/16 (2006.01); B21J 5/08 (2006.01); B21J 9/08 (2006.01); E04B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 9/08 (2013.01); B21C 37/15 (2013.01); B21C 37/16 (2013.01); B21J 5/08 (2013.01); E04B 1/24 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2415 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2418 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2445 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2448 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2451 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2454 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2457 (2013.01); E04B 2001/246 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2472 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2496 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0672475 A1 19950920; EP 0672475 B1 20000607; DE 69424857 D1 20000713; DE 69424857 T2 20001228

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131229

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69424857

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131229

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69424857

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121231

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130107

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69424857

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980623

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960311

1995-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB