Global Patent Index - EP 0672478 B1

EP 0672478 B1 2001-03-07 - Method for punching from metal strip a blank intended, particularly but not exclusively, for producing a furniture hinge casing

Title (en)

Method for punching from metal strip a blank intended, particularly but not exclusively, for producing a furniture hinge casing

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Stanzen eines Rohlings von einem Metallband zur Herstellung von Scharnierbeschlag

Title (fr)

Procédé de poinçonnage d'un flan d'une bande de métal pour la fabrication de ferrure de charnière

Publication

EP 0672478 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95200121 A

Priority

IT MI940088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0672478A1] A method for punching from metal strip (10), by means of at least one die assembly (23), a blank (11, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17) intended particularly but not exclusively for producing a furniture hinge casing, characterised by comprising the following stages: in a first station, punching said blank (11) from the metal strip (10) without leaving any scrap; removing the blank (11) punched out and transferring it to a second station in a suitable position; punching out a second blank (13) identical to the first blank (11); removing the blank (13) punched out and transferring it to said second station in a suitable position; repeating the aforesaid stages, and so on. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0672478 A1 19950920; EP 0672478 B1 20010307; AT 199508 T 20010315; DE 69520237 D1 20010412; DE 69520237 T2 20010809; ES 2155868 T3 20010601; IT 1269451 B 19970401; IT MI940088 A1 19950722; IT MI940088 D0 19940121; PT 672478 E 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110119

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110118

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69520237

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110118

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-28 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20110907

2011-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100104

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090720

2009-07-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090720

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20071226

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010424

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155868 T3

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520237 20010412

2001-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI PT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19950118

2001-03-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199508 T 20010315

1997-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970404

1996-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951221

1995-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI PT

1995-09-20 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 950118