Global Patent Index - EP 0683883 B1

EP 0683883 B1 2001-02-28 - BLUE-FLAME BURNER WITH OPTIMIZED COMBUSTION CHARACTERISTICS

Title (en)

BLUE-FLAME BURNER WITH OPTIMIZED COMBUSTION CHARACTERISTICS

Title (de)

VERBRENNUNGSOPTIMIERTER BLAUBRENNER

Title (fr)

BRULEUR A FLAMME BLEUE OPTIMISANT LA COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 0683883 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95905077 A

Priority

  • DE 4343430 A
  • DE 4430889 A
  • EP 9404204 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9516882A1] The invention concerns a liquid-fuel burner comprising a housing (10), a precombustion chamber (48) containing a nozzle assembly (24) with a nozzle (28) which produces a jet of fuel (80), a combustion chamber (92) in which the fuel jet broadens out, a partition (90) between the precombustion and combustion chambers, and a fan (16) designed to force a stream of combustion air into the combustion chamber, the fuel burning essentially stoichiometrically with a blue flame. In order to improve the burner to minimize the amounts of pollutants in the combustion gases, the invention proposes that, in addition to a stream of combustion air (102) entering the combustion chamber near the fuel jet, a second, recirculation-stabilizing stream of air (106) enters opposite the first stream, at a defined radial distance further out from the first stream. Inside the combustion chamber, an inner recirculation stream (112) is formed which is stabilized by the second stream of combustion air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/40; F23C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/28 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/006 (2013.01); F23C 9/00 (2013.01); F23D 11/28 (2013.01); F23D 11/40 (2013.01); F23C 2202/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9516882 A1 19950622; AT 199451 T 20010315; AT 283449 T 20041215; DK 0683883 T3 20010625; EP 0683883 A1 19951129; EP 0683883 B1 20010228; ES 2154722 T3 20010416; GR 3035908 T3 20010831; PT 683883 E 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141218

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141217

2015-03-11 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20010400762

- Effective date: 20141218

2015-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 199451 T

- Effective date: 20141217

2015-02-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141216

2015-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141224

2015-01-28 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2015-01-07 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141216

2015-01-05 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20141217

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-12-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20141217

2014-12-24 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20141217

2014-12-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409666

2014-12-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409666

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131206

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20131129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131206

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130617

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-03-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59409666

2013-03-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59409666

- Representative's name: ,

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154722 T3

2001-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409666 20010405

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199451 T 20010315

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970805

1998-02-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.

1998-02-25 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.

1997-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970805

1995-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950909

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE