Global Patent Index - EP 0704924 B1

EP 0704924 B1 2000-01-26 - Dielectric filter

Title (en)

Dielectric filter

Title (de)

Dielektrisches Filter

Title (fr)

Filtre diélectrique

Publication

EP 0704924 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95306254 A

Priority

  • JP 23182994 A
  • JP 23183094 A
  • JP 10140095 A
  • US 46944395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0704924A1] A single-stage dielectric band elimination filter has a dielectric block (101) with its outer surfaces mostly covered by an outer conductor and two mutually coupled resonant lines (102, 103) formed therein. Each resonant line has an open end insulated from the outer conductor and a shorted end connected thereto, the open and shorted ends of the two resonant lines (102, 103) being oppositely orientated. A multi-stage dielectric filter has a plurality of such single-stage band elimination filters formed inside a dielectric block, each mutually adjacent pair of the single-stage band elimination filters being interdigitally coupled or combline-coupled to each other with phase shift of pi /2 therebetween. The open end of a resonant line may be formed at one of the end surfaces of the dielectric block, being connected to an electrode insulated from the outer conductor, or at an annular conductor-free area formed on the inner surface of the corresponding throughhole. The resonant lines for forming the plurality of single-stage band elimination filters may be arranged horizontally or vertically with respect to each other. Screening electrodes may be inserted between mutually adjacent resonant lines. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/205

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/205 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/2056 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0704924 A1 19960403; EP 0704924 B1 20000126; DE 69514746 D1 20000302; KR 100201707 B1 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150906

2015-09-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150906

2015-09-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69514746

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140906

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140903

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140903

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514746 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971020

1996-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MURATA MANUFACTURING CO. LTD.

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960307

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB