Global Patent Index - EP 0707274 B1

EP 0707274 B1 2000-05-03 - Multiplication circuit

Title (en)

Multiplication circuit

Title (de)

Multiplikationsschaltung

Title (fr)

Circuit de multiplication

Publication

EP 0707274 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95114823 A

Priority

JP 26112294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0707274A1] A multiplication circuit comprising a plurality of weighting circuit serially connected which comprises a plurality of switching means to which a common analog input voltage in inputted, the switching means being controlled by digital signals, a capacitive coupling with a plurality of capacitances each of which is connected to one of the switching means, an amplifier with high open gain to which an output of the amplifier is connected and a feedback capacitance connecting an output of the amplifier to an input. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06G 7/16 (2006.01); G06J 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06J 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0707274 A1 19960417; EP 0707274 B1 20000503; DE 69516624 D1 20000608; DE 69516624 T2 20000831; JP 3511320 B2 20040329; JP H08101876 A 19960416

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020920

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010921

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516624 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990712

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960703

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB