Global Patent Index - EP 0715237 B1

EP 0715237 B1 2000-03-15 - Circuit arrangement for generation of a regulated output voltage

Title (en)

Circuit arrangement for generation of a regulated output voltage

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordung zur Erzeugung einer geregelten Ausgangsspannung

Title (fr)

Circuit pour la génération d'une tension de sortie régulée

Publication

EP 0715237 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118311 A

Priority

DE 4442466 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4442466C1] The unregulated input voltage (U) is introduced via an input connection (1) and the regulated output voltage (VDD) is tapped from an output connection (2). The load current path of a transistor (3) is connected between the input and output connections. The regulated output voltage is fed to a control amplifier (4) whose output is coupled to the transistor's control connection via a capacitor (8). The capacitor is discharged by a current source (7) controlled by the control amplifier. A charge pump (5) has an output for a raised voltage connected to the transistor's control connection and its output voltage is controlled by the control amplifier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4442466 C1 19951214; EP 0715237 A2 19960605; EP 0715237 A3 19970604; EP 0715237 B1 20000315; US 5654628 A 19970805

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59507999

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59507999

- Effective date: 20111107

2011-10-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Effective date: 20110922

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041121

2004-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041121

2003-10-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031029

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-06-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507999 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990716

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970703

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL