Global Patent Index - EP 0725254 B1

EP 0725254 B1 2000-06-28 - Cooking plate with a cast piece and method for its production

Title (en)

Cooking plate with a cast piece and method for its production

Title (de)

Kochplatte mit einem Gusskörper und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson avec une pièce coulée et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0725254 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100960 A

Priority

DE 19503723 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725254A2] The electric cooking plate for a cooker appliance is a casting, with the cooking surface (12) wholly coated with an enamel layer (26). Also claimed is a mfg. process, where, after the heating elements (17) have been fitted, the enamel coating material is sprayed onto the cooking surface. The enamel is fired at 1000-1100 K, pref. 1050 K.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/10; C23D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23D 5/00 (2006.01); H05B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23D 5/00 (2013.01); H05B 3/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725254 A2 19960807; EP 0725254 A3 19970514; EP 0725254 B1 20000628; AT 194218 T 20000715; AU 4216596 A 19960815; AU 708707 B2 19990812; DE 19503723 A1 19960808; ES 2150025 T3 20001116; ZA 9600821 B 19960812

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090126

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090126

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-01-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-08-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-01-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040125

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-01-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-01-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020102

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150025 T3

2000-09-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ORGANIZZAZIONE D'AGOSTINI

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000815

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605475 20000803

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19960124

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194218 T 20000715

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981016

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970515

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1997-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 960124

1997-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERAETEBAU GMBH

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 960124

1996-08-07 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 960124