Global Patent Index - EP 0736846 B1

EP 0736846 B1 2000-10-25 - Microprocessor system for an electronic postage arrangement

Title (en)

Microprocessor system for an electronic postage arrangement

Title (de)

Mikroprozessorsystem für eine elektronische Frankieranordnung

Title (fr)

Système à microprocesseur pour arrangement d'affranchissement électronique

Publication

EP 0736846 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96110413 A

Priority

  • EP 92114140 A
  • EP 86116058 A
  • US 34387782 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0085385A2] The system has a microprocessor connected to a number of address lines, data lines, and control lines. A memory unit is connected to the address and data lines and to the control lines to enable storage of data in the memory, and reading of data from, under the control of the microprocessor. The memory unit comprises two RAMs each connected to separate groups of the address lines and separate groups of the data lines. The data may be transferred to and from the two RAMs independently of any common interconnection. In this way the possibility of error conditions that are not detectable is reduced.

[origin: EP0085385A2] An electronic postage meter has an accounting unit with redundant nonvolatile random access memories (20, 21) controlled by a microprocessor (10). The redundant random access memories (20, 21) have separate groups of address (22, 24) and data lines (23, 25) to minimize identical errors in data stored therein. Data transfer may occur at different times to and from the memories, with respect to any given byte of data. The system may incorporate redundant microprocessors, and critical parameters may be checked at periodic intervals in the main program of the accounting microprocessor system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/16 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01); G07B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00411 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0085385 A2 19830810; EP 0085385 A3 19841114; CA 1206619 A 19860624; DE 3382744 D1 19940519; DE 3382744 T2 19940901; DE 3382744 T3 20020905; DE 3382810 D1 19970213; DE 3382810 T2 19970522; DE 3382835 D1 20001130; DE 85385 T1 19851205; EP 0513880 A2 19921119; EP 0513880 A3 19930113; EP 0513880 B1 19970102; EP 0736846 A2 19961009; EP 0736846 A3 19961016; EP 0736846 B1 20001025; JP H0797417 B2 19951018; JP S58144989 A 19830829

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20060404

2003-04-01 [NLV7] NL: LAPSED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV7

- Effective date: 20030125

2003-02-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Effective date: 20030124

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-01-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *PITNEY BOWES INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20030125

2003-01-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20030125

2003-01-24 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20030124

2003-01-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20030124

2003-01-24 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: FRANCOTYP POSTALIA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT & CO. KG

2002-08-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: FRANCOTYP POSTALIA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010725

2002-01-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-07 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-07 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020104

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020103

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020103

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-10-31 [D26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D26N

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 3382835

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-30

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-10-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 231452

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-10-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 513880

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1999-08-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: MICROPROCESSOR SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRONIC POSTAGE ARRANGEMENT

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980702

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960627

1996-10-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 513880

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL