Global Patent Index - EP 0749776 B1

EP 0749776 B1 2001-01-24 - Mixer with tubular housing

Title (en)

Mixer with tubular housing

Title (de)

In einem Rohr angeordneter Mischer

Title (fr)

Mélangeur avec corps en forme de tube

Publication

EP 0749776 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810418 A

Priority

EP 95810418 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0749776A1] A mixer assembly incorporated within a pipe (10) consists of one or more elements (1, 1') disrupting the laminar fluid flow. Each element (1, 1') is formed by a disc less two opposing radial sectors, with a baffle edge (5) along one sector face of one diametrical axis, and a second baffle edge (2) along the opposite sector face of the other diametrical axis. The baffles on each element (1, 1') form a cross and act as supports and spacers from the next element (1, 1'). Part-discs and vanes guide the fluid flow at the boundaries (3, 3') between elements (1, 1'). An open gap (4, 4') is maintained on both sides of each baffle (2, 2'). The mixer elements are assembled as a battery in series, each element (1, 1') being slightly rotated during assembly with respect to the adjacent element (1, 1').

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/10 (2006.01); B01F 5/00 (2006.01); B01F 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/0641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0749776 A1 19961227; EP 0749776 B1 20010124; AT 198839 T 20010215; BR 9602858 A 19980422; CA 2178065 A1 19961222; CA 2178065 C 20000530; CN 1052171 C 20000510; CN 1148518 A 19970430; DE 59508992 D1 20010301; ES 2155509 T3 20010516; JP 4283901 B2 20090624; JP H09901 A 19970107; KR 100420822 B1 20040522; TW 315314 B 19970911; US 5944419 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150622

2015-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150928

2015-08-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 198839 T

- Effective date: 20150621

2015-08-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150620

2015-07-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150620

2015-07-01 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150621

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-06-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59508992

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. GRAF AND PARTNER AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, CH

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155509 T3

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508992 20010301

2001-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SULZER MANAGEMENT AG

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198839 T 20010215

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000511

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970530

1997-02-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;SI