Global patent index - EP 0750450 B1

EP 0750450 B1 2000-09-27 - Plasma torch having an essentially axisymmetrical general structure

Title (en)

Plasma torch having an essentially axisymmetrical general structure

Title (de)

Plasmabrenner mit einer wesentlich axisymmetrischen allgemeinen Struktur

Title (fr)

Torche à plasme à structure générale sensiblement axi-symétrique

Publication

EP 0750450 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96450016 A

Priority

FR 9507790 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750450A1] A plasma torch with an essentially axisymmetrical general structure incorporates: (a) a naked torch part (1) in which are arranged one or two tubular electrodes cooled by an appropriate cooling circuit, a field coil (25) and some means (17) for injecting a plasma gas, together with some means (42) for assuring the starting of the torch; and (b) an external structure (2) in which are regrouped the fluid and electrical linkages external to the torch. The naked part (1) of the torch has a carrier structure formed from three coaxial envelopes: namely, an external metal envelope, an intermediate metal envelope defining with the external envelope the return circuit for the cooling fluid, and an internal envelope defining with the intermediate envelope the inlet circuit for the plasma gas to the injection system and channelling through its inner face the inlet flow of the cooling fluid to the electrodes and the field coil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 1/34; H05H 1/28; H05H 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/26 (2006.01); H05H 1/28 (2006.01); H05H 1/34 (2006.01); H05H 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/40 (2013.01); H05H 1/28 (2013.01); H05H 1/34 (2013.01); H05H 2001/3415 (2013.01); H05H 2001/3431 (2013.01); H05H 2001/3489 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0750450 A1 19961227; EP 0750450 B1 20000927; CA 2179655 A1 19961224; CA 2179655 C 20070821; DE 69610464 D1 20001102; DE 69610464 T2 20010719; FR 2735940 A1 19961227; FR 2735940 B1 19970919; JP 4108775 B2 20080625; JP H09115689 A 19970502; US 5695664 A 19971209; ZA 9605303 B 19970414

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-02-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EADS LAUNCH VEHICLES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030620

2002-07-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020701

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020617

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000927

2001-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: EADS LAUNCH VEHICLES

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2001-01-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EADS LAUNCH VEHICLES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610464

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT NL SE

2000-09-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981221

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970612

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT NL SE