Global Patent Index - EP 0755886 B1

EP 0755886 B1 2000-10-11 - Device for feeding printed products to a further work station

Title (en)

Device for feeding printed products to a further work station

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zubringen von Druckereiprodukten zu einer Weiterverarbeitungsstelle

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour alimenter des produits imprimés à une station de traitement ultérieure

Publication

EP 0755886 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110777 A

Priority

CH 218395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0755886A1] The device has a feeder pulley (21), driven synchronously to the suction lifting element (10), which lifts the top product (1) off the intermediate stack (5). One section (31) of a belt conveyor passes around a part of the pulley circumference (28). The pulley has several evenly distributed apertures (26), to pass the product into the guide gap (33), which has previously been inserted into an aperture by the lifting element. The pulley has a star-like profile, and the apertures form pulley segments (27) with concave sides (26a, b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/66; B65H 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/12 (2006.01); B65H 5/24 (2006.01); B65H 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/669 (2013.01); B65H 29/6645 (2013.01); B65H 83/02 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42122 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4213 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42324 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4472 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44732 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4474 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/4472 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2301/44732 + B65H 2220/02
  3. B65H 2301/4474 + B65H 2220/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0755886 A1 19970129; EP 0755886 B1 20001011; AU 5839696 A 19970130; AU 698518 B2 19981029; CA 2181966 A1 19970126; DE 59605979 D1 20001116; DK 0755886 T3 20001113; JP H09118466 A 19970506; US 5664770 A 19970909

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605979

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140705

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-02-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140731

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-07-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030704

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-07-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030704

2002-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605979 20001116

2000-11-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980907

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970611

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE