Global Patent Index - EP 0757927 B1

EP 0757927 B1 2000-02-16 - Device for controlling workpieces

Title (en)

Device for controlling workpieces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le contrôle de pièces

Publication

EP 0757927 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112336 A

Priority

DE 19528811 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0757927A1] The device supplies a workpiece to a measurement arrangement (1) which includes a pivoting seesaw (9), whose swing results in dependence of the workpiece thickness. The swing is measured electronically and is evaluated in a good-bad appraisal. The seesaw is pref. formed as a lever held on one side, and comprising a roll in a predetermined distance from the fixing point. The roll is pref. arranged opposite a second fixed roll, providing a distance which equals the thickness of the metal sheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/24; B65H 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 51/00 (2006.01); B21D 43/24 (2006.01); B65H 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 51/00 (2013.01); B21D 43/24 (2013.01); B65H 7/12 (2013.01); B65H 2511/13 (2013.01); B65H 2511/212 (2013.01); B65H 2511/524 (2013.01); B65H 2553/612 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/13 + B65H 2220/03
  2. B65H 2511/524 + B65H 2220/03
  3. B65H 2511/212 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/11

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19528811 A1 19970206; EP 0757927 A1 19970212; EP 0757927 B1 20000216; ES 2143690 T3 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604454

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110706

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143690 T3

2000-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604454 20000323

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990201

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970418

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT