Global patent index - EP 0770824 B1

EP 0770824 B1 2000-01-26 - Method and circuit for controlling a gas burner

Title (en)

Method and circuit for controlling a gas burner

Title (de)

Verfahren und Schaltung zur Regelung eines Gasbrenners

Title (fr)

Procédé et circuit pour commander un brûleur à gaz

Publication

EP 0770824 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115721 A

Priority

  • DE 19539568 A
  • DE 19618573 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0770824A2] The regulation system uses an ionisation electrode (4) providing an ionisation signal dependent in the temp. or lambda value of the combustion, supplied to a regulation circuit (9) for comparison with a reference value, for adjustment of the air/fuel ratio for the burner (1). A calibration cycle is initiated at regular intervals or after a defined operating time, with the lambda value reduced and the corresponding ionisation signal measured. The max. values of the ionisation signal are stored for correction of the required value for the regulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/02; F23N 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/02 (2006.01); F23N 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/022 (2013.01); F23N 5/123 (2013.01); F23N 2025/30 (2013.01); F23N 2027/20 (2013.01); F23N 2031/30 (2013.01); F23N 2033/08 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770824 A2 19970502; EP 0770824 A3 19980415; EP 0770824 B1 20000126; AT 189301 T 20000215; CA 2188616 A1 19970426; CA 2188616 C 20010109; US 5924859 A 19990720

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-02 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59604283

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141028

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-27 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20140731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-07-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 15.06.2001 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-01 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001001

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-04-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604283

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19961001;LV PAYMENT 19961001;SI PAYMENT 19961001

2000-01-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2000-01-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189301

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990316

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980429

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1998-04-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 961001;LV PAYMENT 961001;SI PAYMENT 961001

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1997-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 961001;LV PAYMENT 961001;SI PAYMENT 961001