Global Patent Index - EP 0780228 B1

EP 0780228 B1 2000-04-19 - Method and means for cleaning the squeegee device of the inking unit of a rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Method and means for cleaning the squeegee device of the inking unit of a rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reinigung einer Rakelvorrichtung für ein Spülfarbwerk einer Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour nettoyer un dispositif de raclage d'un ecrier à circulation d'une machine à imprimer rotative

Publication

EP 0780228 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118005 A

Priority

DE 19548535 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780228A1] The ink is pumped from the chamber between the wiper blades and the inking roller via one of the passages (10,15,16) back into the ink tank (21). Solvent is then pumped from the solvent tank (14) via the feed passage into the chamber, and is then directed via the discharge passages into the ink tank for a predetermined period. The solvent contaminated with ink is pumped for a predetermined period into a dirt tank (23). Supply of the solvent from the solvent tank is then shut off, and it is pumped into the dirt tank. Fresh solvent is then pumped via the feed passage into the chamber, the suction pipe to the solvent tank is shut, and the solvent is circulated for a set time via the feed and discharge passages in a closed flushing circuit, being finally directed into the dirt tank.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/20 (2006.01); B41F 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/04 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 5402724 A 19950404 - YAESO FELIX R [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780228 A1 19970625; EP 0780228 B1 20000419; BR 9606131 A 19981103; CN 1078533 C 20020130; CN 1160639 A 19971001; CZ 290997 B6 20021113; CZ 9603343 A3 19970611; DE 19548535 A1 19970703; DE 19548535 C2 19991230; ES 2145363 T3 20000701; IN 189907 B 20030510; JP 4021510 B2 20071212; JP H09187918 A 19970722; KR 100231073 B1 19991115; TW 410748 U 20001101; US 5816163 A 19981006

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20161228

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151109

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604997

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091109

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091109

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-08-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20040327

2004-05-19 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20040327

2003-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE COMPANY

2003-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: COMEXI S.A.

2003-07-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20010116

2003-07-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: COMEXI S.A.

- Effective date: 20010119

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE COMPANY

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: COMEXI S.A.

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: COMEXI S.A.

- Effective date: 20010119

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145363

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604997

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981030

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971229

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL