Global Patent Index - EP 0789107 A3

EP 0789107 A3 2000-01-19 - Headbox for papermaking machines

Title (en)

Headbox for papermaking machines

Title (de)

Stoffauflauf für Papiermaschinen

Title (fr)

Caisse de tête de machines à papier

Publication

EP 0789107 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97101711 A

Priority

  • DE 4019593 A
  • EP 91109409 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0462472A1] The invention relates to a headbox for papermaking machines, having a distributor for distributing a fed pulp suspension over the working width of the papermaking machine, a guiding device, having a multiplicity of holes or channels, for the pulp suspension and an outflow channel, as wide as the machine, with an outflow gap for distributing the pulp suspension, and also with means for adjusting the stock consistency of the pulp suspension across the working width. The invention is characterised by the following features: (a) The headbox is divided by partitions into sections across its width; (b) the individual section has at least one inlet line for feeding a part-stream (sectional stream); (c) a mixer is provided upstream of the individual inlet line; (d) the mixer has at least two connections for supplying suspension streams (control streams) with preset operating parameters (throughput, stock consistency, fibre quality). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/00 (2006.01); D21F 1/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/06 (2006.01); D21F 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/028 (2013.01); D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/026 (2013.01); D21F 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0462472 A1 19911227; AT 214442 T 20020315; AT 227370 T 20021115; CA 2045038 A1 19911221; CA 2045038 C 20060214; DE 4019593 A1 19920109; DE 4019593 C2 19940120; EP 0785305 A1 19970723; EP 0785305 B1 20020313; EP 0789107 A2 19970813; EP 0789107 A3 20000119; EP 0789107 B1 20021106; FI 20020790 A 20020424; FI 912230 A0 19910508; FI 912230 A 19911221; JP 3301623 B2 20020715; JP H04333688 A 19921120

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-05 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-03-12 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20071206

2008-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-06-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-06-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2003-09-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-06-06 [ET1] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** REVISION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE PATENT OR THE CLAIMS

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59109243 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 462472

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227370 T 20021115

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970801

1997-08-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 462472

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE