Global Patent Index - EP 0808977 B1

EP 0808977 B1 2000-08-16 - Method for controlling an electrically actuated vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Method for controlling an electrically actuated vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ansteuerung eines elektrisch betätigten Kraftfahrzeug-Türschlosses od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Méthode pour le contrôle d'une serrure pour portière de véhicule automobile actionnée de façon électrique

Publication

EP 0808977 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107899 A

Priority

  • DE 19620256 A
  • DE 19623165 A
  • DE 19632915 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0808977A1] The control method allows a locking catch (14) to be released via an electric drive (15), to allow operation of a rotary door catch (13), upon operation of a manual or electronic operating handle (5). Respective microswitches indicate the position of the locking catch and the operating handle, for automatic disconnection of the drive. The drive is returned to its initial state after its original control, with no switch function provided by operation of the handle within an interval which is less than a minimum time interval.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/19; E05B 47/06; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); B60J 5/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/32 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 81/54 (2013.01); E05B 81/66 (2013.01); E05B 81/68 (2013.01); E05B 81/76 (2013.01); E05B 81/82 (2013.01); G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); E05B 77/02 (2013.01); E05B 81/15 (2013.01); E05B 83/36 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); E05B 2015/1664 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0071 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00769 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04); Y10T 292/57 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0808977 A1 19971126; EP 0808977 B1 20000816; BR 9703301 A 19980707; JP H1046893 A 19980217; US 5901991 A 19990511

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080515

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070515

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070515

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070507

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060510

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702180 20000921

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981124

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981124

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980526

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT