Global patent index - EP 0828884 B1

EP 0828884 B1 2000-01-26 - ELECTROSTATIC WEFT STOP MOTION FOR A SHED COURSE LOOM

Title (en)

ELECTROSTATIC WEFT STOP MOTION FOR A SHED COURSE LOOM

Title (de)

ELEKTROSTATISCHER SCHUSSFADENWÄCHTER FÜR EINE REIHENFACHWEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

CASSE TRAME ELECTROSTATIQUE DESTINEE A UN METIER A TISSER AVEC OUVERTURE DES FILS EN SERIE

Publication

EP 0828884 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96909002 A

Priority

  • CH 9600159 W
  • CH 163895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9638617A1] An electrostatic weft stop motion (2) for a shed course loom in which the weft stop motion (2) has a scanning electrode (9) in the form, for example, of an open loop, and in which the loop consists of a base section (9d) and two arms (9e, 9f) and the arms (9e, 9f) are longer than the base section (9d). A weft thread is inserted into a weaving rotor (3) of a shed course loom perpendicularly to the elevation shown, and the weft thread is moved along the curved path (8) and monitored by the weft stop motion (2) over an angle of rotation gamma .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 51/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/00 (2006.01); D03D 51/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/34 (2013.01); D03D 41/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9638617 A1 19961205; AU 5268196 A 19961218; DE 59604307 D1 20000302; EP 0828884 A1 19980318; EP 0828884 B1 20000126; JP H11505896 A 19990525

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050426

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-04-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020415

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604307

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1999-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

1998-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980324

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970806

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT