Global Patent Index - EP 0842363 B1

EP 0842363 B1 2002-12-04 - SPIRAL COMPRESSOR, USEFUL IN PARTICULAR TO GENERATE COMPRESSED AIR FOR RAIL VEHICLES

Title (en)

SPIRAL COMPRESSOR, USEFUL IN PARTICULAR TO GENERATE COMPRESSED AIR FOR RAIL VEHICLES

Title (de)

SPIRALVERDICHTER, INSBESONDERE ZUM EINSATZ BEI DER DRUCKLUFTERZEUGUNG FÜR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

COMPRESSEUR A SPIRALES, SERVANT NOTAMMENT A GENERER DE L'AIR COMPRIME DANS DES VEHICULES SUR RAILS

Publication

EP 0842363 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96925640 A

Priority

  • DE 9601329 W
  • DE 19528005 A
  • DE 19604447 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6017204A] PCT No. PCT/DE96/01329 Sec. 371 Date Dec. 23, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Dec. 23, 1997 PCT Filed Jul. 19, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/05389 PCT Pub. Date Feb. 13, 1997In a totally oil-free spiral compressor (1) with high suction volume flows and compression ratio, useful in particular to generate compressed air for rail vehicles, the spirals are arranged on one side only and measures are taken to compensate for the high axial forces that act on the spiral bearings. Compression chambers (35) arranged with an axial gap between the spirals (7, 9) of the spiral compressor (1) are fed by compression pockets (45) and support the nested spirals against each other. The compression chambers (35) are preferably arranged between a compression crown (15) joined to the driving spiral (7) and a ring wheel (37) of the forcibly driven second spiral (9), so that axial counterforces compensate for the axial forces that act upon the bearings (29, 33) of both spirals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02; F01C 17/06; F04C 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 17/06 (2006.01); F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04C 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 17/06 (2013.01); F04C 18/023 (2013.01); F04C 27/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6017204 A 20000125; EP 0842363 A2 19980520; EP 0842363 B1 20021204; JP H11509902 A 19990831; WO 9705389 A1 19970213

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050719

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FUR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE G.M.B.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030720

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609953 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT SE

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001121

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971016

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT SE