Global Patent Index - EP 0850707 B1

EP 0850707 B1 2001-02-28 - Bending method for a double shaping machine and the relative double shaping machine with movable winged elements

Title (en)

Bending method for a double shaping machine and the relative double shaping machine with movable winged elements

Title (de)

Biegeverfahren für Doppelbiegevorrichtung und dazugehörige Doppelbiegevorrichtung mit bewegbaren drehenden Teilen

Title (fr)

Procédé de pliage pour machine de pliage à deux têtes et ladite machine de pliage comportant des éléments tournants

Publication

EP 0850707 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97116477 A

Priority

IT UD960185 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0850707A1] Bending method for a double shaping machine to bend metallic sections for making left-hand and right-hand bends of 90 DEG and more, the shaping machine comprising two bending stations (10a, 10b) between which there is a gripper element (17), each of the bending stations (10a, 10b) comprising a bending assembly (12) with a rotary disk (13) including a winged contrasting element (15) and a bending pin (14), in which, in order to carry out two consecutive bends, in opposite directions to each other, on the same round piece (16), the following steps are included: the first bend is made on the round piece (16); the winged contrasting element (15) is raised, and the round piece (16) is also raised, up to a level at least higher than the top (14a) of the bending pin; the rotary disk (13) is rotated so as to carry the bending pin (14) to the opposite side of the round piece (16) with respect to the position occupied for the first bend to be made; the winged contrasting element (15) is re-positioned; the round piece (16) advances to a position corresponding to the next bend to be made; a bend is made in the opposite direction to that of the bend made previously. Double shaping machine to carry out the method as above wherein each winged contrasting element (15) is associated with an actuator (18) to lift it above the bending plane by a level correlated to the height of the bending pin (14) and to the lower level on which the round piece (16) to be shaped lies. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 7/06 (2006.01); B21D 11/12 (2006.01); B21F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 11/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0850707 A1 19980701; EP 0850707 B1 20010228; AT 199334 T 20010315; BR 9702934 A 19990615; DE 69704152 D1 20010405; DE 69704152 T2 20010621; DK 0850707 T3 20010326; ES 2156623 T3 20010701; GR 3035498 T3 20010629; IT 1288994 B1 19980925; IT UD960185 A1 19980401; IT UD960185 D0 19961001; JP H10113723 A 19980506; PT 850707 E 20010629

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-09-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050922

2003-07-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-09-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-09-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20010924

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-11 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20010911

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156623 T3

2001-06-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704152 20010405

2001-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-03-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199334 T 20010315

2000-06-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000504

1999-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981221

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI