Global Patent Index - EP 0853693 B1

EP 0853693 B1 2000-04-26 - METHOD FOR THE AUTOMATIC EXTRACTION OF FAULTY WEFT YARNS FROM THE SHED OF A GRIPPER LOOM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE AUTOMATIC EXTRACTION OF FAULTY WEFT YARNS FROM THE SHED OF A GRIPPER LOOM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN ENTFERNEN EINES FALSCHEN SCHUSSFADENS AUS DEM WEBFACH EINER GREIFERWEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'EXTRACTION AUTOMATIQUE DE FILS DE TRAME DEFECTUEUX A PARTIR DE LA FOULE DU METIER A TISSER A PROJECTILE

Publication

EP 0853693 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96934547 A

Priority

  • EP 9604333 W
  • IT MI952038 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9713902A1] A method for the automatic extraction of a short weft yarn from the shed of a gripper loom comprises, upon detection of the error, the following stages: deactivating the cutting means (M) and the weft feeding devices (F) stopping the loom, moving the loom backwards into the position where the faulty weft (A) was inserted; selecting the weft feeding device (F) on the same faulty weft and inserting across the shed with the new weft grippers (C, R) a new weft (A') connected to the faulty weft; recovering the new weft launched and hence the faulty weft (A) on the weft insertion side; moving the loom backwards so as to bring it back into the position where the faulty weft (A) was inserted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 51/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9713902 A1 19970417; DE 69607973 D1 20000531; DE 69607973 T2 20001005; EP 0853693 A1 19980722; EP 0853693 B1 20000426; IT 1276828 B1 19971103; IT MI952038 A1 19970407; IT MI952038 D0 19951006

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101004

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090909

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' MECCANICA TESSILE S.P.A. *SOMET

- Effective date: 20071031

2006-10-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061019

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-07-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607973 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990514

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980327

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI