Global Patent Index - EP 0872789 B1

EP 0872789 B1 2001-03-14 - Circuit arrangement for generating an internal supply voltage

Title (en)

Circuit arrangement for generating an internal supply voltage

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Erzeugung einer internen Versorgungsspannung

Title (fr)

Circuit générateur d'une tension d'alimentation interne

Publication

EP 0872789 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105983 A

Priority

DE 19716430 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872789A2] An internal supply voltage (Vccint) generation circuit arrangement including a reference voltage generator (RG) which detects a voltage proportional to the external supply voltage (Vccext) and then generates a reference voltage (Vref) in dependence of the amplitude of this voltage, the reference voltage serving to control the internal supply voltage (Vccint) generating device. At least two constant voltage values of the reference voltage (Vref) can be generated from the reference voltage generator (RG), the latter comprising at least two voltage sources (VREF1,VREF2), one of which is designed with a double current-mirror circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/24 (2006.01); G05F 1/46 (2006.01); G11C 5/14 (2006.01); G11C 11/407 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872789 A2 19981021; EP 0872789 A3 19990414; EP 0872789 B1 20010314; CN 1197320 A 19981028; DE 19716430 A1 19981119; JP H10301649 A 19981113; TW 371329 B 19991001; US 6194953 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2017-01-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800515

2016-03-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Effective date: 20160212

2015-10-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POLARIS INNOVATIONS LTD., IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, 85579 NEUBIBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59800515

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150616

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: QIMONDA AG, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59800515

2015-06-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POLARIS INNOVATIONS LTD., IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: QIMONDA AG, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59800515

2015-06-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59800515

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-02-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: QIMONDA AG,, DE

- Effective date: 20120123

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080401

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800515 20010419

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-12-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR GENERATING AN INTERNAL SUPPLY VOLTAGE

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IE IT

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990924

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI