Global Patent Index - EP 0876226 B1

EP 0876226 B1 2001-12-05 - ROLL-FORMING UTILIZING SPLITTING TECHNOLOGY

Title (en)

ROLL-FORMING UTILIZING SPLITTING TECHNOLOGY

Title (de)

FORMWALZEN MIT VERWENDUNG VON TRENNUNGSTECHNOLOGIE

Title (fr)

PROFILAGE PAR TECHNIQUE DE FENDAGE

Publication

EP 0876226 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97901752 A

Priority

  • IB 9700137 W
  • US 59253896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727009A1] A method is provided for roll-forming an I-beam structure having a web and a pair of opposing flanges at each end of the web. The method includes the steps of providing a flat blank having a thickness generally equal to a thickness of the web of the I-beam to be formed. The blank has a longitudinal axis, a central portion and opposing ends. Each of the blank ends is split along the longitudinal axis to form first and second flange portions at each of the ends. Each of the first and second flange portions has an edge directed away from the central portion. The flange portions are then bent about the longitudinal axis by moving each of the edges in a direction towards the central portion to form a mass of material at each of the blank ends. The mass of material is compacted at each of the blank ends to define the flanges. Each flange is disposed generally transverse with respect to the longitudinal axis and has a thickness generally equal to the thickness of the web.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/08 (2006.01); B21B 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/088 (2013.01); B21B 1/0815 (2013.01); B21B 1/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9727009 A1 19970731; AT 209973 T 20011215; AU 1555197 A 19970820; CA 2244104 A1 19970731; CA 2244104 C 20060117; DE 69708844 D1 20020117; DE 69708844 T2 20020627; EP 0876226 A1 19981111; EP 0876226 B1 20011205; ES 2169347 T3 20020701

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170123

2017-02-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170123

2017-01-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69708844

2016-11-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69708844

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040126

2005-01-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-01-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-01-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040124

2003-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169347 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708844 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209973 T 20011215

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991116

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980729

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT