EP 0877433 A1 19981111 - Dielectric filter device
Title (en)
Dielectric filter device
Title (de)
Dielektrische Filteranordnung
Title (fr)
Dispositif filtre diélectrique
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 13434797 A 19970507
- JP 13434897 A 19970507
- JP 22110297 A 19970731
Abstract (en)
A dielectric filter device is compact, shows an enhanced level of mechanical strength and is adapted to select a circuit constant with ease, wherein it comprises a dielectric filter having a plurality of resonators (3A; 3B; 3C) provided in a dielectric ceramic block (2; 2'), and a laminated circuit arrangement (10a; 10b; 10c; 10d; 10e) of a plurality of dielectric sheets which is fitted to the open-circuit end surface (2a; 2a') of the dielectric ceramic block (2; 2') and includes a coupling circuit (L; B, H) to be coupled to appropriate ones of the resonators (3A; 3B; 3C) to realize a low-pass (band-pass, high-pass) filter. The filter device can be made to have a neat and simple profile and downsized to minimize the space it requires and can be effectively and efficiently manufactured on a mass production basis. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H01P 1/205 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H01P 1/2056 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 5374910 A 19941220 - YAMAGATA YOSHIFUMI [JP]
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 95, no. 10 30 November 1995 (1995-11-30)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 96, no. 4 30 April 1996 (1996-04-30)
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 416 (E - 1588) 4 August 1994 (1994-08-04)
- [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 95, no. 10 30 November 1995 (1995-11-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 98303595 A 19980507