EP 0883103 A1 19981209 - Direct view liquid crystal display with automatic colour adjustment
Title (en)
Direct view liquid crystal display with automatic colour adjustment
Title (de)
Flüssigkristallanzeige für Direktbetrachtung mit automatischer Farbeinstellung
Title (fr)
Affichage à cristaux liquides à vue directe avec réglage automatique de la couleur
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 97401259 A 19970605
Abstract (en)
The invention relates to a direct view liquid crystal display for colored images, comprising : a LCD panel (10), a light source (16) providing approximately uniform illumination of the rear face of the panel, and color circuit means (34) for controlling the colors of the panel. The display comprises means (32) for controlling the color control means (34) with a signal representing the intensity of the light source and/or the intensity of the ambient light. This signal controls for instance the gamma correction for each color. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G02F 1/133 (2006.01); G09G 3/34 (2006.01); G09G 3/36 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G09G 3/3406 (2013.01); G09G 3/36 (2013.01); G09G 3/3607 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0285 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0606 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0626 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0666 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0673 (2013.01); G09G 2360/144 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 5132825 A 19920721 - MIYADERA SHUNICHI [JP]
- [A] US 5406305 A 19950411 - SHIMOMURA YOUKO [JP], et al
- [A] EP 0735520 A1 19961002 - SHARP KK [JP]
- [A] US 4394688 A 19830719 - IIDA HITOSHI, et al
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 91 (E - 061) 13 June 1981 (1981-06-13)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 96, no. 2 29 February 1996 (1996-02-29)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 95, no. 5 30 June 1995 (1995-06-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0883103 A1 19981209; EP 0883103 B1 20101222; DE 69740083 D1 20110203; JP H1165537 A 19990309
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 97401259 A 19970605; DE 69740083 T 19970605; JP 15634398 A 19980604