Global patent index - EP 0896744 B1

EP 0896744 B1 2000-05-31 - DUAL MODE MICROWAVE BAND PASS FILTER MADE OF HIGH QUALITY RESONATORS

Title (en)

DUAL MODE MICROWAVE BAND PASS FILTER MADE OF HIGH QUALITY RESONATORS

Title (de)

DUAL-MODE-MIKROWELLEN-BANDPASSFILTER AUS HOCHGÜTERESONATOREN

Title (fr)

FILTRE A MICRO-ONDES A BANDE PASSANTE A DEUX MODES REALISE AU MOYEN DE RESONATEURS DE HAUTE QUALITE

Publication

EP 0896744 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97922878 A

Priority

  • DE 9700857 W
  • DE 19617698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19617698C1] A dual mode band pass filter is made of resonators which have each a spherical dielectric arranged on at least one high temperature supraconductive film. The band pass filter also has a shielding housing arranged over the high temperature supraconductive film so as to enclose the dielectric, and a coupling device for coupling the dipole modes, as well as other coupling and tuning elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/20 (2006.01); H01P 1/208 (2006.01); H01P 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/105 (2013.01); Y10S 505/70 (2013.01); Y10S 505/866 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19617698 C1 19971016; CA 2252659 A1 19971113; DE 59701819 D1 20000706; EP 0896744 A1 19990217; EP 0896744 B1 20000531; ES 2148978 T3 20001016; JP 2000509584 A 20000725; US 6484043 B1 20021119; WO 9742679 A1 19971113

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070426

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060427

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-12-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-04-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-04-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060426

2005-04-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050422

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050408

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148978

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-08-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. PIOVESANA PAOLO

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701819

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990927

1999-02-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980922

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE