Global Patent Index - EP 0907423 B1

EP 0907423 B1 2002-09-11 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE METERED APPLICATION OF LIQUIDS TO MATERIAL WEBS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE METERED APPLICATION OF LIQUIDS TO MATERIAL WEBS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DOSIERTEN AUFBRINGEN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN AUF MATERIALBAHNEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION DOSEE DE LIQUIDES SUR DES BANDES DE MATERIAU

Publication

EP 0907423 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97932713 A

Priority

  • DE 9701350 W
  • DE 19627322 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19627322C1] The sheet material (4) to be coated is fed over the surface of an ultrasound-vibration system (1). The vibration system produces a periodically opening gap (5) between the sheet material and the upper surface of the vibration system. The opening gap is timed with the applied work frequency, and the fluid is applied onto the sheet material through the gap. The sheet material to be coated is pressed by compressed air or an elastic co-rotating roller, onto the ultrasound vibration system. The fluid is applied through the ultrasound vibration system onto the material and the amount of fluid is exactly adjusted by a controlled feed pump, depending upon the throughflow speed of the sheet material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02; B05C 3/18; B05C 9/02; B05C 9/08; B05C 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 3/18 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 9/02 (2006.01); B05C 9/08 (2006.01); B05C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 9/02 (2013.01); B05C 3/18 (2013.01); B05C 5/0245 (2013.01); B05C 9/08 (2013.01); B05C 11/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19627322 C1 19971120; EP 0907423 A1 19990414; EP 0907423 B1 20020911; JP 2000512543 A 20000926; JP 3481949 B2 20031222; WO 9749499 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070625

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080625

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070626

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708202 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011210

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990126

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE