Global Patent Index - EP 0909850 A3

EP 0909850 A3 2000-12-13 - Woven glass web

Title (en)

Woven glass web

Title (de)

Textilglasgewebebahn

Title (fr)

Bande de tissu de verre

Publication

EP 0909850 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118639 A

Priority

DE 29718222 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909850A2] The woven web is composed of 100% textile glass fibers, with a self-adhesive layer on the reverse side. At least sections of the filaments in the warps and wefts, forming the front side of the material, are coated with a thin layer of a polymer adhesion primer to carry a single- or multi-color print. The polymer primer is printed as a thin layer only in zones for a decorative pattern. The polymer adhesion primer is transparent or translucent or is colored. The polymer adhesion primer is made of or contains polyurethane. The thin polymer layer is resistant to ironing or wet rubbing. The decorative pattern is applied by dye print, transfer print, ink jet printing, plotter printing or rotary press printing. The thin polymer adhesion primer or the decorative print additionally contains an ultraviolet stabilizer such as a benzotriazol derivative or heat stabilizer such as a piperidine derivative. Open zones are left at the intersections between the warps and wefts. The printed pattern is covered by a transparent or translucent or a colored coating. The material can be finished using aqueous emulsions of piperidine derivatives. The decorative pattern is a continuous patterning or motifs or pattern or motif repeats, in at least one direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06N 7/00; D03D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/00 (2006.01); D06N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/0011 (2013.01); D06N 7/0092 (2013.01); D06N 2201/082 (2013.01); D06N 2203/068 (2013.01); D06N 2209/0807 (2013.01); D06N 2209/0861 (2013.01); D06N 2209/1657 (2013.01); D06N 2211/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] GB 2249994 A 19920527 - HEXCEL GENIN SA [FR]
  • [X] US 4495012 A 19850122 - BERENGER DANIEL [FR]
  • [DY] DE 8124330 U1 19811112 - SAUER WIGBERT
  • [DY] WO 9306301 A1 19930401 - FORBO CP LTD [GB]
  • [Y] GB 732421 A 19550622 - GERRIT JAN LUTJE WOOLDRIK
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198440, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A87, AN 1984-246026, XP002149930
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199345, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A23, AN 1993-356881, XP002149931
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198842, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A97, AN 1988-297228, XP002149932

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718222 U1 19990218; AT 257526 T 20040115; EP 0909850 A2 19990421; EP 0909850 A3 20001213; EP 0909850 B1 20040107

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2005-10-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051012

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-07-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-04-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040418

2004-04-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810538 P 20040212

2004-01-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06N 7/00 A, 7D 03D 15/00 B

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI