Global Patent Index - EP 0910745 B1

EP 0910745 B1 2002-11-27 - DIAPHRAGM FOR A DIAPHRAGM PUMP

Title (en)

DIAPHRAGM FOR A DIAPHRAGM PUMP

Title (de)

MEMBRANE FÜR EINE MEMBRANPUMPE

Title (fr)

MEMBRANE POUR UNE POMPE A MEMBRANE

Publication

EP 0910745 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97938821 A

Priority

  • DE 29612117 U
  • EP 9703698 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802661A1] The invention relates to a diaphragm for a diaphragm pump which has a diaphragm body (2) consisting of resilient material, comprising a substantially annular outer region of a relatively low thickness and an adjacent central region which becomes thicker radially towards the centre, and a solid moulded core (3) cured in the central region of the diaphragm body (2) and for connection to a pump drive part, wherein (a) the outer diameter (F) of the moulded core (2) is less than a third of the outer diameter (D) of the diaphragm body (1), and (b) the material thickness (L) of the diaphragm body (1) in the central region above the moulded core is between 5 % and 20 % of the outer diameter (D) of the diaphragm. Said diaphragm can be used to avoid, on both sides of the top dead centre region, undesirable deformation of the diaphragm (1) surface facing the pump chamber (5) during a tilt transmitted from the drive rods to the moulded core (3). Said diaphragm (1) can therefore be used to produce a diaphragm pump with a low clearance volume and a large compression ratio.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/02 (2006.01); F04B 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/0054 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29612117 U1 19960912; EP 0910745 A1 19990428; EP 0910745 B1 20021127; JP 2000517392 A 20001226; US 6055898 A 20000502; WO 9802661 A1 19980122

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040621

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KNF- NEUBERGER GMBH

- Effective date: 20030822

2003-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030721

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708833 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011025

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980420

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT