Global Patent Index - EP 0916611 A3

EP 0916611 A3 2000-09-13 - Method of operating a textile machine for producing crosswound bobbins as well as an apparatus for such a textile machine

Title (en)

Method of operating a textile machine for producing crosswound bobbins as well as an apparatus for such a textile machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Kreuzspulen herstellenden Textilmaschine sowie Vorrichtung für eine solche Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'une machine textile pour la fabrication de bobines à spires croisées ainsi qu'un dispositif pour une telle machine

Publication

EP 0916611 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118040 A

Priority

DE 19750726 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916611A2] For the operation of a bobbin winder, to produce cross wound bobbins, an ultrasonic sensor (30) scans the transport system (21) which moves the finished bobbins, with its signals to be processed by the doffer (23). The running times of the signals are compared for different measurement stretches, and their relationships are evaluated to give scanning values without additional climatic conditions to give the loading state of the transport system at the delivery point of each workstation (2). A reference sonic signal from the sensor is used by the control (38) to give a correction value according to climatic conditions. The correction value is taken into account for the scanning signals from the bobbin transport to give an accurate reading of the loading state of the transport system at the delivery points. The running time of the reference signal is measured over a reference stretch, and compared with known climatic conditions for the stretch, for deviations to show the effect of current climatic conditions, to be taken into account when processing scanning signals. An Independent claim is included for the apparatus which has a reflector at the sonic cone (47) from the sensor at the doffer, to form a reference stretch between it and the sensor. Preferred Features: The reflector is formed by a swing bobbin guide wire at the bobbin guide arm (41) of the doffer, or by an angled plate. The sonic cone at the sensor has a width, at the delivery point, which matches the workstation intervals of the machine (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/06 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/0411 (2013.01); B65H 2553/30 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916611 A2 19990519; EP 0916611 A3 20000913; DE 19750726 A1 19990520; JP H11217159 A 19990810; TR 9802330 A2 19991021; TR 9802330 A3 19991021; US 6138937 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031108

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020828

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI