Global Patent Index - EP 0919067 B1

EP 0919067 B1 2000-11-29 - CHARGED PARTICLE VELOCITY ANALYSER

Title (en)

CHARGED PARTICLE VELOCITY ANALYSER

Title (de)

GESCHWINDIGKEITSANALYSATOR GELADENER TEILCHEN

Title (fr)

ANALYSEUR DE VITESSE DE PARTICULES CHARGEES

Publication

EP 0919067 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97936783 A

Priority

  • GB 9702182 W
  • GB 9617312 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9808244A2] An ion velocity analyser 10 comprises a source (12) of ions, which source is in a vacuum. The ions are focused into a beam by a series of electrostatic lenses in the focus section (14) of the ion velocity analyser (10). The beam is modulated by a deflector (16) to give a pseudo-random binary signal having pulses of variable length. The modulator beam travels down in an evacuated drift tube (18) having a chosen electrostatic potential to a detector (20). The signal from the detector (20) is amplified and the signal intensity feature of an array of time channels is measured and recorded by a multichannel analyser (22); the resultant signal is a convolution of the pseudo-random binary signal and the time of flight spectrum of the ion sample. The signal from the detector is cross-correlated with the modulated signal and deconvoluted to give a time of flight spectrum for the ion sample. The time of flight spectrum is then inverted to give a mass spectrum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 49/40; H01J 49/00; H01J 49/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/0031 (2013.01); H01J 49/022 (2013.01); H01J 49/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9808244 A2 19980226; WO 9808244 A3 19980409; DE 69703624 D1 20010104; DE 69703624 T2 20010628; EP 0919067 A2 19990602; EP 0919067 B1 20001129; GB 9617312 D0 19960925

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090818

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090818

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080725

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2006-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703624 20010104

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01J 49/40 A, 7H 01J 49/44 B, 7H 01J 49/00 B

1999-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6H 01J 49/40 A, 6H 01J 49/44 B, 6H 01J 49/00 B

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990310

1999-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB