EP 0921588 A1 19990609 - Variable wideband microwave TT-arranged pin diode attenuator
Title (en)
Variable wideband microwave TT-arranged pin diode attenuator
Title (de)
Variables breitbandiges Mikrowellen-Dämpfungsglied mit in pi-Form angeordneten Pin-Dioden
Title (fr)
Atténuateur hyperfréquence variable à large bande avec des diodes pin arrangées en forme pi
Publication
Application
Priority
IT MI972468 A 19971105
Abstract (en)
A variable wideband pi attenuator is described comprising three PIN diodes, two being part of the shunt arms of the attenuator and one belonging to the series arm. With the use of suitable matching networks (RA1, RA2, RM1, RM2), that vanish the effects produced by the parasitic elements present in the PIN diode network, a considerable amplitude of the operating band is obtained. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H01P 1/22 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H01P 1/227 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5109204 A 19920428 - KEEFER LYNDON [US]
- [A] US 4009456 A 19770222 - HOPFER SAMUEL
- [A] DE 4311474 A1 19941013 - DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE [DE]
- [X] V.N. IL'YUSHENKO: "POTENTIAL CHARACTERISTICS OF SOME STRUCTURES OF ELECTRICALLY CONTROLLED ATTENUATORS", TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RADIO ENGINEERING., vol. 40/41, no. 2, February 1986 (1986-02-01), NEW YORK, NY US, pages 124 - 127, XP002092661
- [DA] WAUGH R W: "A LOW COST SURFACE MOUNT PIN DIODE PI ATTENUATOR", MICROWAVE JOURNAL, vol. 35, no. 5, 1 May 1992 (1992-05-01), pages 280, 282 - 284, XP000304901
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 3, no. 31 16 March 1979 (1979-03-16)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE ES FR GB SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0921588 A1 19990609; IT 1295919 B1 19990528; IT MI972468 A1 19990505
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 98440242 A 19981030; IT MI972468 A 19971105