Global patent index - EP 0924337 A3

EP 0924337 A3 2000-04-26 - Press roll

Title (en)

Press roll

Title (de)

Presswalze

Title (fr)

Rouleau de presse

Publication

EP 0924337 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122860 A

Priority

DE 19756226 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924337A2] The press roller, for a paper making machine, has a cylindrical metal body (12) with an outer cladding (14) of at least one layer (16,18). At least the radially outermost layer (16) of the roller cladding (14) has a continuously changing construction in the radial direction (R) and over its thickness (d), in terms of its chemical composition and/or structure. The roller cladding (14) is applied at least partially by spraying. The bottom layer (18) of the cladding (14) is directly against the metal core (12), to prevent corrosion, to lie between the metal roller body (12) and the outer layer (16). The outermost layer (16) of the roller cladding (14) contains at least an oxide, and especially of Al2O3, Cr2O3, ZrO2, TiO2, SiO2 and/or the like. It contains at least one carbide and especially WC, CrC and/or the like, and at least one nitride and especially TiN and/or the like, and/or at least one boride and especially TiB2 and/or the like, or a mixture of two or more of these components. The radially outermost layer (16) can be a ceramic/metal material with at least one oxide of Al2O3, Cr2O3, ZrO2, TiO2, SiO2 and/or the like. The outer layer (16) contains a plastics component and especially polytetrafluoroethylene, silicon and/or the like. The inner layer (18) also has a continually changing construction over at least part of its thickness, in terms of its chemical composition and/or structure, with a continuous construction change through the whole thickness of the total roller cladding (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924337 A2 19990623; EP 0924337 A3 20000426; EP 0924337 B1 20040623; AT 269916 T 20040715; DE 19756226 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121202

2013-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59811595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121202

2013-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 269916

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121202

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-03-24 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20091015

2007-08-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-02-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Effective date: 20050317

2006-12-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061203

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-12-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030407

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI