Global patent index - EP 0931018 A4

EP 0931018 A4 2000-02-23 - METHOD OF INHIBITING GELLING OF SILOXANE FEEDSTOCKS AND A GEL INHIBITED FEEDSTOCK

Title (en)

METHOD OF INHIBITING GELLING OF SILOXANE FEEDSTOCKS AND A GEL INHIBITED FEEDSTOCK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR INHIBIERUNG VON SILOXANGELIERTEN EINSÄTZE UND GEL INHIBIERTER EINSATZ

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INHIBITION DE LA GELIFICATION DE CHARGES DE SILOXANE ET CHARGE INHIBEE PAR UN GEL

Publication

EP 0931018 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97910721 A

Priority

  • US 9717495 W
  • US 2800896 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9815499A1] A method of inhibiting the gelling of a silica forming siloxane feedstock and the gelling inhibited silica feedstock which includes an end capping compound. The method of inhibiting the gelling of a siloxane feedstock during the silica glass manufacturing process includes end capping the siloxane feedstock prior to converting the siloxane feedstock into silica.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 19/14; C01B 33/12; C03C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/00 (2006.01); C01B 33/12 (2006.01); C01B 33/152 (2006.01); C01B 33/32 (2006.01); C03B 19/14 (2006.01); C03C 1/02 (2006.01); C07F 7/08 (2006.01); C07F 7/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03B 19/1415 (2013.01); C03B 2207/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PA] WO 9722553 A1 19970626 - CORNING INC [US], et al
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 4, 24 July 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 27441, UNUMA HIDERO ET AL.: "Preparation of silica glass fibers tetraethylorthosilicate and hexamethyldisiloxane" XP002125070 & NIPPON SERAMIKKUSU KYOKAI GAKUJUTSU RONBUNSHI, vol. 97, no. 3, 1989, pages 208 - 212NIPPON SERAMIKKUSU KYOKAI GAKUJUTSU RONBUNSHI1989973208212
  • [PA] TAKAHISA IDA ET AL.: "A facile preparation of polysiloxane containing tributylin group as efficient protection group", CHEMISTRY LETTERS., no. 12, 1996, CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. TOKYO., JP, pages 1047 - 1048, XP002125109, ISSN: 0366-7022
  • See also references of WO 9815499A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9815499 A1 19980416; AU 4802297 A 19980505; CA 2267794 A1 19980416; CN 1232436 A 19991020; EP 0931018 A1 19990728; EP 0931018 A4 20000223; JP 2001502312 A 20010220

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031108

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-02-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000111

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 03B 19/14 A, 7C 03C 1/02 B, 7C 01B 33/12 B

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990506

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT