Global Patent Index - EP 0931922 A3

EP 0931922 A3 2000-04-26 - Method and apparatus to purify the exhaust gas of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus to purify the exhaust gas of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Reinigen von Abgasen eines Verbrennungsmotors

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d' épuration de gaz d' échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0931922 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123165 A

Priority

DE 19802631 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0931922A2] A parameter correlating with SOx storage capacity of catalyst (9) is determined, using sensors of the engine management unit (3). Should this undershoot a given value, de-sulfatization is initiated, by changeover from lean to rich burn. Controlled secondary air is introduced ahead of the lambda sensor (8), just after the engine. The exhaust : secondary air ratio is monitored by the sensor; and controlled (3) to a given value. A temperature sensor (10) is used to infer SOx storage catalyst temperature controlled to a given value. When the parameter reaches a satisfactory level, lean burn is resumed. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding equipment and instrumentation. Preferred Features: During desulfatization, exhaust air ratio is controlled by the secondary air addition and/or by combustion stoichiometry. A bypass (13) around the NOx storage catalyst (11) is activated during desulfatization only. Suitable branching, and remotely operated valves or dampers are provided. A similar procedure is used to regenerate the NOx storage catalyst, once the SOx catalyst has been restored. For desulfatization, lambda = 0.75 - 0.99. The temperature in the SOx storage catalyst exceeds 550 degrees C during this process. A remotely controlled engine choke effects lean to rich burn changeover. The control aims at constant engine torque or constant power.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/02; F01N 3/08; F01N 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F01N 3/24 (2006.01); F01N 9/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F01N 3/22 (2006.01); F02B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/085 (2013.01); F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 3/0878 (2013.01); F01N 3/0885 (2013.01); F01N 3/22 (2013.01); F02B 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802631 C1 19990722; EP 0931922 A2 19990728; EP 0931922 A3 20000426; EP 0931922 B1 20011024; JP H11280456 A 19991012; US 6119450 A 20000919; US 6318073 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091204

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091204

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091204

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805965 20021121

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-10-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-09-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000318

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02D 41/02 A, 7F 01N 3/08 B, 7F 01N 3/22 B

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI