Global patent index - EP 0933796 A3

EP 0933796 A3 2000-10-18 - Electromagnetic trip relay in particular for earth fault protection devices

Title (en)

Electromagnetic trip relay in particular for earth fault protection devices

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisches Auslöserelais, insbesondere für Fehlerstromschutzeinrichtungen

Title (fr)

Déclencheur électromagnetique en particulier pour des dispositifs de protection contre les courants de défaut

Publication

EP 0933796 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100382 A

Priority

DE 29801584 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933796A2] Fault current protection system includes electromagnetic trip relay in which an armature plate (3) bears against pole surfaces (4) of the armature under magnetic force against spring tension. A protective coating (20) is applied to one or both of the abutting faces and consists of an organic substance with the structure of a plasma polymer. The protective coating, which may be 20 nm to 1000 nm thick, comprises hexamethyldisilane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/08 (2006.01); H01H 71/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/327 (2013.01); H01F 7/081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29801584 U1 19980416; EP 0933796 A2 19990804; EP 0933796 A3 20001018

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060103

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI