Global patent index - EP 0936041 A3

EP 0936041 A3 2000-05-31 - Process for making concrete articles

Title (en)

Process for making concrete articles

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Betonteilen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'articles en béton

Publication

EP 0936041 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123983 A

Priority

DE 19806322 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936041A2] The underneath base ring (22) remains with the newly finished concrete parts (10,20) for removing the concrete parts from the mold. The newly completed concrete parts are stacked vertically (30) on a base surface and removed to a storage place after a setting period. The second newly completed concrete part (20) is stacked on top of the first newly set concrete part (10). The concrete arts stacked on the lowest concrete parts are support especially by feet (23) on the top support surface (18) of the end ring (12) belonging to the concrete part underneath it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 21/76; B28B 21/90; B28B 21/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/00 (2006.01); B28B 21/90 (2006.01); B28B 21/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 21/90 (2013.01); B28B 7/0055 (2013.01); B28B 21/92 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2309499 A 19970730 - STONEWARE TECH LTD [IE]
  • [A] US 4151246 A 19790424 - LESTER DUDLEY R [ZA], et al
  • [A] DE 806952 C 19510621 - ERWIN BROSS DIPL ING
  • [A] "KIMPLETTSYSTEME FUR DIE SCHACHTPRODUKTION", BETONWERK + FERTIGTEIL TECHNIK,DE,BAUVERLAG GMBH. WIESBADEN, vol. 56, no. 2, 1 February 1990 (1990-02-01), pages 105 - 107, XP000115801, ISSN: 0373-4331
  • [A] KRAISS R: "KASILITH MIT MODERNER SCHACHTFERTIGUNG KASILITH WITH MODERN MANHOLE PRODUCTION", BETONWERK + FERTIGTEIL TECHNIK,DE,BAUVERLAG GMBH. WIESBADEN, vol. 62, no. 11, 1 November 1996 (1996-11-01), pages 117 - 120, XP000633483, ISSN: 0373-4331

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19806322 A1 19990812; EP 0936041 A2 19990818; EP 0936041 A3 20000531

INPADOC legal status

2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001202

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI