Global patent index - EP 0937162 A4

EP 0937162 A4 2000-11-15 - EXTRUDING AND FORGING AN ALUMINUM SILICON ALLOY

Title (en)

EXTRUDING AND FORGING AN ALUMINUM SILICON ALLOY

Title (de)

EXTRUDIEREN UND SCHMIEDEN VON ALUMINIUM-SILIZIUM-LEGIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

EXTRUSION ET FORGEAGE D'UN ALLIAGE ALUMINIUM-SILICIUM

Publication

EP 0937162 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98934292 A

Priority

  • US 9814031 W
  • US 5227597 P
  • US 6295697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902749A1] The present invention comprises a method for manufacturing a solid extruded configuration constructed of an Al-Si alloy. Initially, a billet comprising aluminum and silicon is prepared for extrusion. The Al-Si billet is then heated and inserted into an extruding press. Finally, the Al-Si billet is extruded through an extruding die, having a preconfigured die slot configuration resulting in an extruded Al-Si product. The Al-Si product may then be treated for desired tempering or age hardening to produce a final extruded product with improved mechanical and machinability properties as compared to non-extruded Al-Si products. The extruded Al-Si product may further be cold/warm impact extruded or cold/warm/hot forged to achieve a final desired configuration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22F 1/043

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/043 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4908077 A 19900313 - NAKAMURA KOUJI [JP], et al
  • [PX] EP 0790325 A1 19970820 - HOOGOVENS ALUMINIUM NV [BE]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 337 (C - 0862) 27 August 1991 (1991-08-27)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 07 31 August 1995 (1995-08-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 05 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 247 (M - 835) 8 June 1989 (1989-06-08)
  • See also references of WO 9902749A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902749 A1 19990121; AU 8385398 A 19990208; EP 0937162 A1 19990825; EP 0937162 A4 20001115

INPADOC legal status

2001-09-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-11-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990407

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE