Global Patent Index - EP 0939970 A4

EP 0939970 A4 2000-04-12 - MULTI-ANODE TIME TO DIGITAL CONVERTER

Title (en)

MULTI-ANODE TIME TO DIGITAL CONVERTER

Title (de)

MEHRANODEN ZEIT-DIGITALUMSETZER

Title (fr)

CONVERTISSEUR DU TEMPS EN DONNEES NUMERIQUES, A ANODES MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 0939970 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97949425 A

Priority

  • US 9720766 W
  • US 75150996 A
  • US 81489897 A
  • US 81837697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9821742A1] An apparatus (82) for extending the dynamic range of a data acquisition. Multiple anode detectors (80) and microchannel plates (83) are used to increase the dynamic range of a time-to-digital converter (82). Multiple anodes (80) determine characteristics of a signal without distortion which normally occurs with large signals, or obscuring by noise which normally occurs with small signals. The data from the multi-anode detectors (80) can be summed during selectable time frames (100, 102) and made multiple bit words.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 37/252; H01J 49/02; H01J 49/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/62 (2006.01); H01J 49/02 (2006.01); H01J 49/06 (2006.01); H01J 49/40 (2006.01); H01J 49/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04F 10/005 (2013.01); G04F 10/00 (2013.01); H01J 49/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5166521 A 19921124 - HAYASHI SHIGEKI [JP], et al
  • [A] FESTA, SELLEM: "AMultistop Time-to-Digital Converter", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS, vol. 188, 1981, pages 99 - 104, XP000872261
  • See also references of WO 9821742A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9821742 A1 19980522; AU 7181898 A 19980603; EP 0939970 A1 19990908; EP 0939970 A4 20000412; JP 2001504265 A 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080402

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040916

2000-04-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01J 37/252 A, 7H 01J 49/40 B, 7H 01J 49/02 B

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990611

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE