Global Patent Index - EP 0947962 A3

EP 0947962 A3 2000-05-17 - A method of balancing the load in a process for sorting objects

Title (en)

A method of balancing the load in a process for sorting objects

Title (de)

Eine Methode zum Ausgleichen der Last in einem Prozess zum Sortieren von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Un procédé d'équilibrage de charge dans un procédé de tri d'objets

Publication

EP 0947962 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105376 A

Priority

IT TO980233 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947962A2] The sorting process comprises performing a first and at least a second consecutive sorting cycle by means of a postal machine and the present invention relates to a method of balancing to be performed before the commencement of the sorting process and comprising the step of performing, in at least one of the sorting cycles, at least one of the following procedures: a) a first procedure of balancing the load of the outputs of the postal machine in the current sorting cycle based on at least one of the following balancing criteria: shifting the delivery addresses from the outputs to which they are assigned to respective logically contiguous outputs associated with the same postman; bisection of delivery address into respective pairs of virtually separate delivery address and allocating them to a respective pair of logically contiguous outputs associated with the same postman; and allocation of further outputs to postmen on the basis of an order of criticality of the outputs already allocated to the postman themselves; and b) a second procedure of balancing the load of the outputs of the postal machine in the current sorting cycle based on at least one of the following balancing criteria: distribution over outputs utilised in the current sorting cycle of delivery addresses allocated to each output at the end of the subsequent sorting cycle; shifting the delivery addresses from the outputs to which they are allocated to respective logically contiguous outputs; exchange of delivery addresses between logically contiguous outputs; and bisection of delivery addresses into respective pairs of virtually separate delivery addresses and allocating them to a respective pair of logically contiguous outputs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02; B07C 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/02 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/02 (2013.01); G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00338 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00379 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00443 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00475 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00483 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00491 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00596 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947962 A2 19991006; EP 0947962 A3 20000517; IT TO980233 A1 19990917; NO 991284 A 19990920; NO 991284 D0 19990317

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071001

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/02 A, 7B 07C 3/02 B

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI